Ashley Prior v. State of South Carolina
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN B. MCCREE, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, SCDC Kirkland Staff, SHERIFF OF COLUMBIA, BRYAN P. STIRLING, JAMES & JOAN DOE 1-10, DHEC and SCDC Investigators of Health Services, etc and STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Plaintiff / Appellant: ASHLEY T. PRIOR
Case Number: 19-7381
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 20, 2019 Ashley Prior v. State of South Carolina

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01619-TMC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:39 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. 11/01/2019 [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:29 PM]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Ashley Prior #290973. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Financial Section, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Post Office Box 21787, Columbia, SC 29221, Ashley Prior. [1000609788] [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:27 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Ashley T. Prior. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:23 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ashley T. Prior. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:21 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ashley T. Prior KIRKLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ICS 163-BF2 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 10/25/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:09 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Ashley T. Prior ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Ashley Prior. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:03 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01619-TMC. Case manager: KHancock. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley Prior v. State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN B. MCCREE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, SCDC Kirkland Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERIFF OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN P. STIRLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES & JOAN DOE 1-10, DHEC and SCDC Investigators of Health Services, etc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASHLEY T. PRIOR
Represented By: Ashley T. Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?