In re: Michael Singleton
Petitioner: In re: MICHAEL A. SINGLETON, a/k/a Justice, f/k/a Michael A. Singleton, #1081861
Case Number: 20-103
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] 2244 case. Mailed to: Michael Singleton. [20-103] CP [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:56 AM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 2244 case docketed. Case manager: CPoulsen. [20-103] CP [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:42 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for authorization to file successive application for post-conviction relief (Local Rule 22(d)) filed by Michael A. Singleton. Is PSR available on district court docket? NA. Has sentencing transcript been prepared? NA. [20-103] CP [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Michael Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: MICHAEL A. SINGLETON, a/k/a Justice, f/k/a Michael A. Singleton, #1081861
Represented By: Michael A. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?