Denise Miller v. Trident Asset Management
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED, SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC., L.P., TRANS UNION LLC, AFNI, INCORPORATED, DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC., CREDIT MANAGEMENT, L.P., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC and FIRST PREMIER BANK
Plaintiff / Appellant: DENISE MILLER
Defendant / Appellee: TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 20-1096
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Denise Miller in 20-1096, 19-2413. [20-1096, 19-2413] Jeffrey Styles [Entered: 03/27/2020 03:20 PM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 15 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Denise Miller. [20-1096] Jeffrey Styles [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:21 PM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2413, 20-1096] MRB [Entered: 03/06/2020 08:18 AM]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 04/09/2020. Response brief due 05/11/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000696629] [19-2413, 20-1096] DL [Entered: 03/05/2020 02:14 PM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Trident Asset Management in 19-2413, 20-1096 to Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-2413, 20-1096] Bradley Canter [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:41 AM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION by Denise Miller in 19-2413, 20-1096 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix.. Date and method of service: 03/04/2020 ecf. [1000695993] [19-2413, 20-1096] Jeffrey Styles [Entered: 03/04/2020 07:57 PM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Denise Miller in 19-2413, 20-1096. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000695429] [19-2413, 20-1096] Jeffrey Styles [Entered: 03/04/2020 10:11 AM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Denise Miller in 19-2413, 20-1096. [1000695171] [19-2413, 20-1096] Jeffrey Styles [Entered: 03/03/2020 05:07 PM]
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Denise Miller in 19-2413, 20-1096 re: filing of appearance form. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days, filing of docketing statement. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days, failure to satisfy fee requirements. [19-2413, 20-1096] CH [Entered: 03/02/2020 11:37 AM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Denise Miller in 19-2413, 20-1096 re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 02/27/2020 from Jeffrey Warren Styles, filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement due from Denise Miller on 02/27/2020. Mailed to: Jeffrey Styles, Michael Chapman, and Matthew Fogleman. [19-2413, 20-1096] CH [Entered: 02/20/2020 10:10 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jeffrey Styles, Matthew Fogleman, and Michael K. Chapman. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/10/2020. Response Brief due 04/09/2020 [19-2413, 20-1096] CH [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:33 AM]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1096 with 19-2413. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jeffrey Styles, Matthew Fogleman, and Michael K. Chapman. [1000673022] [19-2413, 20-1096] CH [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:26 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02538-ADC. Mailed to: Jeffrey Styles, Matthew Fogleman, and Michael K. Chapman. [20-1096] CH [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:19 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Jeffrey Styles - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 03/02/2020 Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02538-ADC. Mailed to: Jeffrey Styles, Matthew Fogleman, and Michael K. Chapman. [20-1096] CH [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:12 AM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02538-ADC. Case manager: CHalupa. [20-1096] CH [Entered: 01/29/2020 04:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Denise Miller v. Trident Asset Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC., L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFNI, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREDIT MANAGEMENT, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST PREMIER BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENISE MILLER
Represented By: Jeffrey Styles
Represented By: Jeffrey Warren Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Matthew Fogleman
Represented By: Bradley Todd Canter
Represented By: Michael K. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?