HIAS, Inc. v. Donald Trump
Defendant / Appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services, DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States, CHAD WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security and MICHAEL R. POMPEO, in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Plaintiff / Appellee: LUTHERAN IMMIGRATION & REFUGEE SERVICE, INC., CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, INC. and HIAS, INC.
Case Number: 20-1160
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 8, 2021 Summary HIAS, Inc. v. Trump

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 26 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Response brief due 05/26/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000713484] [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 04/01/2020 02:35 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. to extend filing time for response brief until May 26, 2020 (30-day extension).. Date and method of service: 04/01/2020 ecf. [1000713479] [20-1160] Justin Cox [Entered: 04/01/2020 02:31 PM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 23 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mariko Hirose for Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. [1000709028] [20-1160] Mariko Hirose [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:33 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 25 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 22 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [463]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/26/2020. [1000710085] [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 02:46 PM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 21 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf. Number of pages: [42]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/26/2020. [1000710084] [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 02:45 PM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf. [1000708704] [20-1160] Amanda Mundell [Entered: 03/24/2020 06:25 PM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000708701] [20-1160] Amanda Mundell [Entered: 03/24/2020 06:20 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Deke Shearon for HIAS, Inc., Church World Service, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. [1000698527] [20-1160] Deke Shearon [Entered: 03/09/2020 04:57 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey Resetarits for HIAS, Inc., Church World Service, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. [1000698524] [20-1160] Jeffrey Resetarits [Entered: 03/09/2020 04:55 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 18 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf. [20-1160] Amanda Mundell [Entered: 02/27/2020 05:08 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 8 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000690637] [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:43 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa S. Keaney for Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. [1000690224] [20-1160] Melissa Keaney [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:55 AM]
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf to response [ # 14 ], Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 8 ].. [20-1160] Amanda Mundell [Entered: 02/19/2020 10:48 AM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. to Motion [ # 8 ], notice requesting response [ # 10 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1160] Justin Cox [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:48 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000684904] [20-1160] Justin Cox [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:03 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Church World Service, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000684901] [20-1160] Justin Cox [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:02 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HIAS, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000684899] [20-1160] Justin Cox [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:01 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE ISSUED to Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 8 ]. Response due: 02/18/2020 by 4:00 pm.[1000683819].. [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:33 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 02/14/2020 ecf, US mail. [1000683792] [20-1160] Amanda Mundell [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:15 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin B Cox for Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc. and Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. [1000683520] [20-1160] Justin Cox [Entered: 02/14/2020 10:18 AM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amanda L. Mundell for Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf. [1000683488] [20-1160] Amanda Mundell [Entered: 02/14/2020 10:01 AM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark B. Stern for Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad Wolf. [1000683478] [20-1160] Mark Stern [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:56 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/24/2020. Response Brief due 04/23/2020. Mailed to: Linda Evarts, Mariko Hirose. [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:27 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] case. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-03346-PJM. Mailed to: Linda Evarts, Mariko Hirose. [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:25 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-03346-PJM. Case manager: JeffNeal. [20-1160] JSN [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: HIAS, Inc. v. Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Amanda Lee Mundell
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Amanda Lee Mundell
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHAD WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Amanda Lee Mundell
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO, in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Amanda Lee Mundell
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUTHERAN IMMIGRATION & REFUGEE SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Deke Shearon
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Resetarits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Deke Shearon
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Resetarits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HIAS, INC.
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Deke Shearon
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Resetarits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?