Janet Valluzzi v. Alex Azar, II
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Department of Heath and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: JANET L. VALLUZZI
Case Number: 20-1287
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ]. Number of days granted: 60. Opening brief and appendix due 07/17/2020. Response brief due 08/17/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000734737] [20-1287] CB [Entered: 05/07/2020 07:30 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Janet L. Valluzzi to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until July 18, 2020.. Date and method of service: 05/06/2020 ecf. [1000734681] [20-1287] Raymond Hogge [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:32 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Raymond L. Hogge, Jr. for Janet L. Valluzzi. [1000734164] [20-1287] Raymond Hogge [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:16 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jane Andersen for Alex M. Azar, II. [1000731004] [20-1287] Jane Andersen [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:11 AM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/18/2020. Response Brief due 06/16/2020. [20-1287] CB [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:52 AM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Janet L. Valluzzi. [20-1287] Marc Smith [Entered: 04/06/2020 05:00 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janet L. Valluzzi. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000715908] [20-1287] Marc Smith [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:50 PM]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion to rescind [ # 6 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000715771] [20-1287] CB [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:52 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Janet L. Valluzzi Marc J. Smith, counsel to rescind Informal Briefing Schedule. Date and method of service: 04/06/2020 ecf. [1000715751] [20-1287] Marc Smith [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:41 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marc J. Smith for Janet L. Valluzzi. [1000715577] [20-1287] Marc Smith [Entered: 04/06/2020 12:57 PM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-03602-PX. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1287] TW [Entered: 03/13/2020 10:36 AM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/25/2020. [20-1287] CB [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:48 AM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Janet Valluzzi. Informal Opening Brief due 04/06/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1287] CB [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:35 AM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-03602-PX. Case manager: CBennett. [20-1287] CB [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Janet Valluzzi v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Department of Heath and Human Services
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANET L. VALLUZZI
Represented By: Marc Jonathan Smith
Represented By: Janet L. Valluzzi
Represented By: Raymond Lee Hogge Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?