Calvin Norton v. Columbus Board of Elections
Defendant / Appellee: JAMES E. PREVATTE, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner, SCOTT ANDREW YATES, individually and in his official capacity as registered agent, president, and board of director of Red Dome Group, Inc., CHARLES MCDOWELL, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner, LESLIE MCCRAE DOWLESS, JR., individually and in his official capacity as Contractor employee of Red Dome Group, Inc., JESS HILL, individually and in his official capacity as Clerk of Columbus County, AMANDA PRINCE, individually and in her official capacity as counsel employee for Columbus County Government, COLUMBUS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, BRENDEN JONES, individually and in his official capacity as NC State House of Representatives 46th District, TRENT BURROUGHS, individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of Columbus County Board of Commissioners, AARON HERRING, individually and in his official capacity uncertified Chief Deputy of Columbus County, JODY STEADMAN GREENE, Uncertified Sheriff of Columbus County, individually and in his official capacity as not residency or domicile of Columbus County to run for the office of Sheriff, JEROME MCMILLIAN, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Commissioner, RED DOME GROUP, INC., a business nonprofit corporation, CARLA STRICKLAND, individually and in her official capacity as Director of Columbus County Board of Elections, DANNY EARL BRITT, JR., individually and in his official capacity as NC State Senator and License Attorney, TUCKER MACK WARD, individually and in his official capacity as Board Member of Columbus County Board of Elections, BOYD T. WORLEY, individually and in his official capacity as license attorney, RICKY BULLARD, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner, WESTERN SURETY CO., d/b/a CNA Surety Insurance, Surety for Columbus County Sheriff, BONITA BLAKNEY, individually and in her official capacity as Vice Chairman of the Board of Elections, JOANN GARRELL, individually and in her official capacity as Board Member of Columbus County Board of Elections, NORWOOD PITT BLANCHARD, III, individually and in his officially capacity as license attorney, LEWIS L. HATCHER, Sheriff of Columbus County, individually and in his official capacity as Sheriff of Columbus County, HAROLD FIPPS, individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of Columbus County Board of Elections, COLUMBUS COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, EDWIN P. RUSS, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner, GILES E. BYRD, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner and WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, d/b/a CNA Surety Insurance, Surety for Columbus County Sheriff
Interested Party: JEFF CARMON, DAVID BLACK, BOB CORDLE, KEN RAYMOND, NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF ELECTIONS and STELLA ANDERSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: CALVIN TYRONE NORTON
Case Number: 20-1333
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 29, 2021 Calvin Norton v. Columbus Board of Elections

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lewis L. Hatcher. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000739326] [20-1333] RE [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:45 PM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 27 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF to Jody Greene by Calvin Tyrone Norton. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 05/04/2020 04:02 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF to Western Surety by Calvin Tyrone Norton. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 04/28/2020 10:33 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 25 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF to Boyd Worley by Calvin Tyrone Norton. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 04/28/2020 10:32 AM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Jody Steadman Greene. [20-1333] Dan Hartzog [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:23 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Boyd T. Worley. [20-1333] David Coats [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:19 AM]
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Western Surety Company. [20-1333] William Freeman [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:28 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danny Earl Britt, Jr. and Brenden Jones. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000721680] [20-1333] RE [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:47 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Calvin Tyrone Norton. [20-1333] TW [Entered: 04/10/2020 11:00 AM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calvin Tyrone Norton. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000718965] [20-1333] TW [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:58 AM]
April 8, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Columbus County Board of Elections, Bonita Blakney, Joann Garrell, Tucker Mack Ward, Carla Strickland, Trent Burroughs, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Giles E. Byrd, Edwin P. Russ, Ricky Bullard, Charles McDowell and Amanda Prince. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000717570] [20-1333] Norwood Blanchard [Entered: 04/08/2020 12:41 PM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scott Andrew Yates. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000716472] [20-1333] Mark Jones [Entered: 04/07/2020 10:30 AM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Calvin Tyrone Norton and Bonita Blakney, Norwood Pitt Blanchard, III, Danny Earl Britt, Jr., Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Jess HIll, Lewis L. Hatcher, Aaron Herring, Brenden Jones, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Edwin P. Russ, Carla Strickland, Tucker Mack Ward and Scott Andrew Yates re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Oscar Blanks, Danny Britt, Calvin Norton, Andrew Penny. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:42 AM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Whitfield Gibson for Western Surety Company. [1000716320] [20-1333] Jonathan Gibson [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:02 AM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Dome Group, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000714328] [20-1333] Mark Jones [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:51 PM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark A. Jones, Esq. for Red Dome Group, Inc. and Scott Andrew Yates. [1000714327] [20-1333] Mark Jones [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:51 PM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kathryn Hicks Shields for Jess HIll. [1000714181] [20-1333] Kathryn Shields [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:14 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jody Steadman Greene. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000713370] [20-1333] Dan Hartzog [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:27 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael B. Cohen for Jody Steadman Greene. [1000713367] [20-1333] Michael Cohen [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:25 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dan Hartzog Jr. for Jody Steadman Greene. [1000713366] [20-1333] Dan Hartzog [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:22 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boyd T. Worley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000713211] [20-1333] David Coats [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:50 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David S. Coats for Boyd T. Worley. [1000713209] [20-1333] David Coats [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:49 AM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Norwood Pitt Blanchard, III. [1000711077] [20-1333] Norwood Blanchard [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:29 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western Surety Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000710816] [20-1333] William Freeman [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:17 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William E. Freeman for Western Surety Company. [1000710807] [20-1333] William Freeman [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:12 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00088-D. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 03/19/2020 02:54 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Calvin Norton, Oscar Blanks, Danny Britt, Jonathan Gibson and Andrew Penny. Informal Opening Brief due 04/13/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 03/19/2020 02:51 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00088-D. Case manager: REdwards. [20-1333] RE [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Calvin Norton v. Columbus Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES E. PREVATTE, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT ANDREW YATES, individually and in his official capacity as registered agent, president, and board of director of Red Dome Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Jones
Represented By: Kevin Guy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES MCDOWELL, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE MCCRAE DOWLESS, JR., individually and in his official capacity as Contractor employee of Red Dome Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESS HILL, individually and in his official capacity as Clerk of Columbus County
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA PRINCE, individually and in her official capacity as counsel employee for Columbus County Government
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLUMBUS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDEN JONES, individually and in his official capacity as NC State House of Representatives 46th District
Represented By: Danny Earl Britt Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRENT BURROUGHS, individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of Columbus County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AARON HERRING, individually and in his official capacity uncertified Chief Deputy of Columbus County
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JODY STEADMAN GREENE, Uncertified Sheriff of Columbus County, individually and in his official capacity as not residency or domicile of Columbus County to run for the office of Sheriff
Represented By: Michael Bernard Cohen
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEROME MCMILLIAN, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Commissioner
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RED DOME GROUP, INC., a business nonprofit corporation
Represented By: Mark A. Jones
Represented By: Kevin Guy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLA STRICKLAND, individually and in her official capacity as Director of Columbus County Board of Elections
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANNY EARL BRITT, JR., individually and in his official capacity as NC State Senator and License Attorney
Represented By: Danny Earl Britt Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUCKER MACK WARD, individually and in his official capacity as Board Member of Columbus County Board of Elections
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOYD T. WORLEY, individually and in his official capacity as license attorney
Represented By: David Stebbins Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICKY BULLARD, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTERN SURETY CO., d/b/a CNA Surety Insurance, Surety for Columbus County Sheriff
Represented By: Jonathan Whitfield Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BONITA BLAKNEY, individually and in her official capacity as Vice Chairman of the Board of Elections
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOANN GARRELL, individually and in her official capacity as Board Member of Columbus County Board of Elections
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORWOOD PITT BLANCHARD, III, individually and in his officially capacity as license attorney
Represented By: Andrew Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEWIS L. HATCHER, Sheriff of Columbus County, individually and in his official capacity as Sheriff of Columbus County
Represented By: Oscar M. BLanks III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAROLD FIPPS, individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of Columbus County Board of Elections
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLUMBUS COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWIN P. RUSS, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GILES E. BYRD, individually and in his official capacity as Columbus County Board of Commissioner
Represented By: Norwood Pitt Blanchard III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, d/b/a CNA Surety Insurance, Surety for Columbus County Sheriff
Represented By: Jonathan Whitfield Gibson
Represented By: William Eric Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JEFF CARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BOB CORDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KEN RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STELLA ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALVIN TYRONE NORTON
Represented By: Calvin Tyrone Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?