Genesis HealthCare, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II
Plaintiff / Appellant: GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: GEORGE SIGOUNAS, as Administrator of the Health Resources and Services Administration, KRISTA PEDLEY, as Captain in the United States Public Health Service and Director of the Office of Pharmacy Affairs in the Health Resources and Services Administration and ALEX M. AZAR, II, as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-1701
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Mediation forms. [20-1701] MRB [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:45 AM]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 10/13/2020. Response brief due 11/12/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000799310] [20-1701] EB [Entered: 08/25/2020 04:26 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Genesis HealthCare, Inc. to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until October 12, 2020.. Date and method of service: 08/25/2020 ecf. [1000799131] [20-1701] Daniel Westbrook [Entered: 08/25/2020 02:38 PM]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 09/10/2020. Response brief due 10/13/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000782216] [20-1701] EB [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:53 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [20-1701] MRB [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:53 AM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Abby C. Wright for Alex M. Azar, II, Krista Pedley and George Sigounas. [1000774409] [20-1701] Thais-Lyn Trayer [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:55 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel J. Westbrook for Genesis HealthCare, Inc.. [1000773896] [20-1701] Daniel Westbrook [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:26 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thais-Lyn Trayer for Alex M. Azar, II, Krista Pedley and George Sigounas. [1000773886] [20-1701] Thais-Lyn Trayer [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:17 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Margaret N. Fox for Genesis HealthCare, Inc.. [1000773804] [20-1701] Margaret Fox [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:42 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genesis HealthCare, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000773798] [20-1701] James Griffin [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:40 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Genesis HealthCare, Inc.. [20-1701] James Griffin [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:39 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James M. Griffin for Genesis HealthCare, Inc.. [1000773792] [20-1701] James Griffin [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:37 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/10/2020. Response Brief due 09/09/2020. [20-1701] EB [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:57 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-01531-RBH. [20-1701] EB [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:55 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-01531-RBH. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-1701] EB [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Genesis HealthCare, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: Daniel J. Westbrook
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE SIGOUNAS, as Administrator of the Health Resources and Services Administration
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Thais-Lyn Trayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTA PEDLEY, as Captain in the United States Public Health Service and Director of the Office of Pharmacy Affairs in the Health Resources and Services Administration
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Thais-Lyn Trayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Thais-Lyn Trayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?