Alkesh Tayal v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALKESH TAYAL
Defendant / Appellee: EQUITY TRUSTEES, LLC, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as trustee, on behalf of the Holder of the Alternative Loan Trust 2005-62, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-62, JOHN DOE and SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Case Number: 20-1790
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [20-1790] LHP [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:25 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 07/15/2020 hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Christopher Edwin Brown for plaintiff/appellant Alkesh Tayal.. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00509-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter on 10/19/2020. [20-1790] MR [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:28 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alkesh Tayal. [20-1790] Christopher Brown [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:45 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Alkesh Tayal re: filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from Alkesh Tayal on 08/10/2020.. [20-1790] MR [Entered: 08/06/2020 09:07 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alkesh Tayal. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000788014] [20-1790] Christopher Brown [Entered: 08/05/2020 05:03 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher E. Brown for Alkesh Tayal. [1000788013] [20-1790] Christopher Brown [Entered: 08/05/2020 05:02 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert R. Michael for Equity Trustees, LLC. [1000784601] [20-1790] Robert Michael [Entered: 07/30/2020 03:07 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000784489] [20-1790] Donald Pocock [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:33 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000784488] [20-1790] Donald Pocock [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:32 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald R. Pocock for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon. [1000784487] [20-1790] Donald Pocock [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:31 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equity Trustees, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000784474] [20-1790] Robert Michael [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:06 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00509-AJT-JFA.. [20-1790] MR [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:59 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00509-AJT-JFA. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1790] MR [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:57 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00509-AJT-JFA. Case manager: MRadday. [20-1790] MR [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alkesh Tayal v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALKESH TAYAL
Represented By: Christopher Edwin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQUITY TRUSTEES, LLC
Represented By: David Lance Ward
Represented By: Robert Ryan Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as trustee, on behalf of the Holder of the Alternative Loan Trust 2005-62, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-62
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?