Terry Capone v. The City of Columbia
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERRY H. CAPONE
Defendant / Appellee: DR. MICHAEL GREEN, SOUTH CAROLINA WORKERS' COMPENSATION COMMISSION, RICHLAND COUNTY OMBUDSMAN'S OFFICE, COMPANION THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATORS, HENRY GENE MCCASKILL, In his individual capacity, DORIS MCCUBBINS, In her individual capacity and THE CITY OF COLUMBIA, Employer
Case Number: 20-1904
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time due to extraordinary circumstances [ # 10 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 11/16/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000830050] [20-1904] CT [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:45 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Terry H. Capone to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 10/14/2020 US mail. [1000829584] [20-1904] CT [Entered: 10/15/2020 08:36 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Terry H. Capone. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000811441] [20-1904] CT [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:16 AM]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 10/14/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000809101] [20-1904] CT [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:36 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Terry H. Capone re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: T. Capone. [20-1904] CT [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:22 AM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Terry H. Capone to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 10/14/2020.. Date and method of service: 09/10/2020 US mail. [1000809077] [20-1904] CT [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:10 AM]
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jacqueline M. Pavlicek for The City of Columbia. [1000799966] [20-1904] Jacqueline Pavlicek [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:19 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-02490-CMC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1904] CT [Entered: 08/21/2020 02:05 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 09/14/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1904] CT [Entered: 08/21/2020 02:01 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Terry H. Capone - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 09/21/2020 Originating case number: 3:19-cv-02490-CMC.. [20-1904] CT [Entered: 08/21/2020 01:56 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-02490-CMC. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-1904] CT [Entered: 08/21/2020 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terry Capone v. The City of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY H. CAPONE
Represented By: Terry H. Capone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MICHAEL GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTH CAROLINA WORKERS' COMPENSATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHLAND COUNTY OMBUDSMAN'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMPANION THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRY GENE MCCASKILL, In his individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DORIS MCCUBBINS, In her individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CITY OF COLUMBIA, Employer
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Pavlicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?