Kylon Middleton v. Marci Andino
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: JAMES H. LUCAS, Speaker of the South Carolina House of Representatives and HARVEY PEELER, in his capacity as President of the South Carolina Senate
Defendant / Appellant: SCOTT MOSELEY, in his official capacity as member of the South Carolina Election Commission, MARCI ANDINO, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the South Carolina State Election Commission, JOHN WELLS, in his official capacity as Chair of the South Carolina State Election Commission and CLIFFORD J. ELDER, in his official capacity as member of the South Carolina Election Commission
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Plaintiff / Appellee: AMOS WELLS, ERNESTINE MOORE, TONYA WINBUSH, DEMOCRATIC CONGRESSIONAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE, CARLYLE DIXON, SOUTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, KYLON MIDDLETON, DEON TEDDER and DNC SERVICES CORPORATION/DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Intervenor: SOUTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY
Case Number: 20-2022
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 28, 2020 Summary Kylon Middleton v. Marci Andino
September 30, 2020 Summary Kylon Middleton v. Marci Andino

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 55 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to intervene on appeal [ # 22 ]; denying Motion for leave to file separate briefs [ # 22 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000829363] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:23 PM]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 53 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 12/02/2020. Response brief due 01/04/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000828668] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 10/14/2020 09:39 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, James H. Lucas, Scott Moseley, Harvey Peeler, South Carolina Republican Party and John Wells to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 12/2/2020.. Date and method of service: 10/14/2020 ecf. [1000828580] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:52 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 52 SUPREME COURT REMARK--stay granted. [20-2022] PSC [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:41 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 51 OPINION ATTACHMENT. [20-2022] Internet citation to Ely Portillo and Jim Morrill article in The Charlotte Observer (cited to in Judge Wilkinsons and Judge Agees opinions). JR [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:23 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 50 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tonya Winbush. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000822013] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:53 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 49 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amos Wells. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000822012] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:52 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deon Tedder. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000822009] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:51 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ernestine Moore. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000822007] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:50 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kylon Middleton. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000822006] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:49 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 45 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carlyle Dixon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000822004] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:48 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Carlyle Dixon, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Kylon Middleton, Ernestine Moore, South Carolina Democratic Party, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells and Tonya Winbush. [1000821723] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:37 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 43 Published COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to stay injunction pending appeal and for administrative stay [ # 12 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000820974] [20-2022]--[Edited 09/30/2020 by PSC-document formatting correction] AB [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:10 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 42 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sopen B. Shah for Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Carlyle Dixon, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Kylon Middleton, Ernestine Moore, South Carolina Democratic Party, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells and Tonya Winbush. [1000820328] [20-2022] Sopen Shah [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:31 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, James H. Lucas, Scott Moseley, Harvey Peeler, South Carolina Republican Party and John Wells. [1000819999]. [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:14 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 40 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Carlyle Dixon, Kylon Middleton, Ernestine Moore, South Carolina Democratic Party, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells and Tonya Winbush re: filing of appearance form and disclosure statements. Appearance form due on 10/01/2020 from Bruce Van Spiva. Disclosure statement due from Carlyle Dixon, Kylon Middleton, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells, Tonya Winbush and Ernestine Moore on 10/01/2020. [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:00 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 39 Amended Published COURT ORDER filed granting rehearing en banc. Copies to all parties. [1000818447] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:12 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 37 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Published COURT ORDER filed granting rehearing en banc. Copies to all parties. [1000818142] [20-2022]--[Edited 09/28/2020 by AB - see ECF 39 for amended court order] AB [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:06 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 36 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to stay injunction pending appeal and for administrative stay [ # 12 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000817261] [20-2022]--[Edited 09/28/2020 by AB - court order vacated at ECF 39] AB [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:26 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, James H. Lucas, Scott Moseley, Harvey Peeler, South Carolina Republican Party and John Wells to Motion [ # 22 ], Motion [ # 22 ]. [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:57 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY by Harvey Peeler and James H. Lucas to response [ # 24 ]. [20-2022] Matthew Carroll [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:55 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, Scott Moseley and John Wells to response [ # 24 ]. [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:31 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Carolina Democratic Party. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000816456] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:52 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000816452] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:47 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000816449] [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:41 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State of South Carolina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No. [1000816431] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:11 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James Emory Smith, Jr. for State of South Carolina. [1000816429] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:10 PM]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER filed granting filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [1000816403] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:53 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE ISSUED to Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, James H. Lucas, Scott Moseley, Harvey Peeler, South Carolina Republican Party and John Wells requesting response to Motion to intervene on appeal [ # 22 ], Motion for leave to file separate briefs [ # 22 ]. Response due: 09/24/2020 by 3:00 p.m. [1000816390] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:42 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux for Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Carlyle Dixon, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Kylon Middleton, Ernestine Moore, South Carolina Democratic Party, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells and Tonya Winbush. [1000816271] [20-2022]--[Edited 09/23/2020 by AB] Adriel Cepeda Derieux [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:23 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE/ANSWER by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Carlyle Dixon, Kylon Middleton, Ernestine Moore, South Carolina Democratic Party, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells and Tonya Winbush to Motion [ # 12 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-2022] Bruce Spiva [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:16 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by State of South Carolina in electronic and paper format. [1000816230] [20-2022] James Smith [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:01 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Mary Thomas, Nea Richard, The Family Unit, Inc., and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP to intervene on appeal and for leave to file separate briefs. Date and method of service: 09/23/2020 ecf. [22] [1000816224] [1000816224] [20-2022]. Adriel Cepeda Derieux [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:57 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Carolina Republican Party. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000816165] [20-2022] Robert Tyson [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:10 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert E. Stepp for South Carolina Republican Party. [1000816021] [20-2022] Robert Stepp [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:09 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by M. Elizabeth Crum for Marci Andino, Scott Moseley, John Wells and Clifford J. Elder. [1000816018] [20-2022] Mary Crum [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:07 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert E. Tyson, Jr. for South Carolina Republican Party. [1000816014] [20-2022] Robert Tyson [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:04 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/02/2020. Response Brief due 12/02/2020. [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:54 AM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin A. Hall for Harvey Peeler. [1000815773] [20-2022] Kevin Hall [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:20 AM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark C. Moore for James H. Lucas. [1000815761] [20-2022] Mark Moore [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:09 AM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew Todd Carroll for Harvey Peeler. [1000815625] [20-2022] Matthew Carroll [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:27 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE ISSUED to DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Carlyle Dixon, Kylon Middleton, Ernestine Moore, South Carolina Democratic Party, Deon Tedder, Amos Wells and Tonya Winbush requesting response to Motion to stay injunction pending appeal and for administrative stay [ # 12 ]. Response due: 09/23/2020 by 3:00 p.m. [1000815584] [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:23 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, James H. Lucas, Scott Moseley, Harvey Peeler, South Carolina Republican Party and John Wells to stay injunction pending appeal and for administrative stay. Date and method of service: 09/22/2020 ecf. [1000815562] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:51 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James H. Lucas. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000815555] [20-2022] Susan McWilliams [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:46 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Susan P. McWilliams for James H. Lucas. [1000815554] [20-2022] Susan McWilliams [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:45 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jane W. Trinkley for Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, Scott Moseley and John Wells. [1000815540] [20-2022] Jane Trinkley [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:37 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, Scott Moseley and John Wells. [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:31 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] case. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-01730-JMC. Mailed to: J. Robert Bolchoz, Harrison David Brant, and Vordman Carlisle Traywick. [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:28 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scott Moseley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000815525] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:27 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clifford J. Elder. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000815519] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:26 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Wells. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000815517] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:25 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marci Andino. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000815514] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-01730-JMC. Case manager: ABrownlee. [20-2022] AB [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:19 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wm. Grayson Lambert for Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, Scott Moseley and John Wells. [1000815497] [20-2022] William Lambert [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kylon Middleton v. Marci Andino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: JAMES H. LUCAS, Speaker of the South Carolina House of Representatives
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Represented By: Mark C. Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: HARVEY PEELER, in his capacity as President of the South Carolina Senate
Represented By: Kevin Alan Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCOTT MOSELEY, in his official capacity as member of the South Carolina Election Commission
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Jane Wilroy Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARCI ANDINO, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the South Carolina State Election Commission
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Jane Wilroy Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN WELLS, in his official capacity as Chair of the South Carolina State Election Commission
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Jane Wilroy Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CLIFFORD J. ELDER, in his official capacity as member of the South Carolina Election Commission
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Jane Wilroy Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: James Emory Smith Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMOS WELLS
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERNESTINE MOORE
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONYA WINBUSH
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEMOCRATIC CONGRESSIONAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLYLE DIXON
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SOUTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KYLON MIDDLETON
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEON TEDDER
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DNC SERVICES CORPORATION/DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Christopher J. Bryant
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SOUTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY
Represented By: Robert E. Tyson Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?