Zetia (Ezetimibe) Antitrust v. Merck & Company, Incorporated
Defendant / Appellant: MERCK & COMPANY, INCORPORATED, MSP SINGAPORE CO. LLC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SCHERING CORPORATION, GLENMARK GENERICS INC., USA and SCHERING PLOUGH CORPORATION
Not Classified By Court: In re: ZETIA (EZETIMIBE) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: CESAR CASTILLO, INC., individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated, FWK HOLDINGS, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED and ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.
Case Number: 20-2184
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 42 ]. Number of days granted: 11. Reply brief due 02/23/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000861410] [20-2184] JR [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:00 AM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 44 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin C. Burns for FWK Holdings, LLC. [1000858104] [20-2184] Erin Burns [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:24 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc. to Motion [ # 42 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 12/01/2020 01:44 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation to extend filing time for reply brief until February 23, 2021.. Date and method of service: 11/30/2020 ecf. [1000856267] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/30/2020 08:06 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 41 OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [20-2184] David Sorensen [Entered: 11/30/2020 06:43 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 40 Corrected Customized BRIEFING ORDER filed -- FRAP 30(c) Schedule. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Page-Proof Opening Brief due: 01/04/2021. Page-Proof Response Brief due: 02/02/2021. Appendix under FRAP 30(c) due: 02/05/2021. All Briefs in Final Form due 7 days after FRAP 30(c) Appendix served. [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:59 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 39 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Customized BRIEFING ORDER filed -- FRAP 30(c) Schedule. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Page-Proof Opening Brief due: 01/04/2021. Page-Proof Response Brief due: 02/02/2021. Appendix under FRAP 30(c) due: 02/16/2021. All Briefs in Final Form due 7 days after FRAP 30(c) Appendix served. [20-2184]--[Edited 11/24/2020 by AB] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:55 PM]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed with a deferred appendix [ # 36 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000854400] [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:44 PM]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER filed rescinding accelerated briefing order. Copies to all parties. [1000854396] [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:42 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation to proceed with a deferred appendix. Date and method of service: 11/23/2020 ecf. [1000853348] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:00 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 35 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ellen T. Noteware for Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [1000851789] [20-2184] Ellen Noteware [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:18 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 34 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marc C. Greco for Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [1000851603] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:46 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 33 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/18/2020 08:42 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merck & Company, Incorporated and Schering Plough Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000850900] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/18/2020 08:39 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Schering Corporation and MSP Singapore Co. LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000850899] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/18/2020 08:36 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000850702] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:02 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FWK Holdings, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000850698] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:00 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000850696] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:57 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 27 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jessica J. Taticchi for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850056] [20-2184] Jessica Taticchi [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:10 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 26 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary M. Johns for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850055] [20-2184] Zachary Johns [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:08 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by R. Brendan Fee for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850054] [20-2184] R. Fee [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:06 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven A. Reed for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850053] [20-2184] Steven Reed [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:05 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer L. Eaton for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850052] [20-2184] Jennifer Eaton [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:03 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dustin M. Paul for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850050] [20-2184] Dustin Paul [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:02 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000850049] [20-2184] Richard Ottinger [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:01 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard H. Ottinger for Glenmark Generics INC., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. [1000850046] [20-2184] Richard Ottinger [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:59 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicholas Urban for Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [1000849897] [20-2184] Nicholas Urban [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:02 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David F. Sorensen for Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [1000849889] [20-2184] David Sorensen [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:59 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher D. Dusseault for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000848350] [20-2184] Christopher Dusseault [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:02 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 Accelerated BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/06/2021. Response Brief due 02/05/2021. Any Reply Brief due 02/26/2021. [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:31 AM]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed granting Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 6 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000848025] [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:18 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas M. Sobol for FWK Holdings, LLC. [1000847865] [20-2184] Thomas Sobol [Entered: 11/13/2020 05:51 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen Edward Noona for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000847594] [20-2184] Stephen Noona [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:48 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley J. Hamburger for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000847553] [20-2184] Bradley Hamburger [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:04 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel R. Adler for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000847552] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:00 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000847544] [20-2184] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:48 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation to Motion [ # 6 ], Motion [ # 6 ], notice requesting response [ # 7 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-2184] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:45 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED to Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 6 ], Motion to expedite decision [ # 6 ]Response due 11/23/2020.[1000846507]. [20-2184] AW [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:06 AM]
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc. to accelerate case processing. , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 11/11/2020 ecf. [1000846035] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/11/2020 04:08 PM]
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William H. Monroe, Jr. for Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [1000846033] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/11/2020 03:55 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. [20-2184] JR [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:00 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Mr. Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., Esq., Mr. Christopher D. Dusseault, Jennifer L. Eaton, R. Brendan Fee, Zachary M. Johns, Mr. Stephen Edward Noona, Richard Hooper Ottinger, Dustin Mitchell Paul, Steven A. Reed, Jessica J. Taticchi - after grant of permission to appeal Originating case number: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. [20-2184] JR [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:59 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 20-432. Record complete? Yes. [20-2184] TF [Entered: 11/02/2020 02:16 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. Case manager: JRice. [20-2184] TF [Entered: 11/02/2020 02:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Zetia (Ezetimibe) Antitrust v. Merck & Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MERCK & COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Daniel Rolf Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MSP SINGAPORE CO. LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Daniel Rolf Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Daniel Rolf Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Eaton
Represented By: Richard Hooper Ottinger
Represented By: R. Brendan Fee
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jessica J. Taticchi
Represented By: Zachary M. Johns
Represented By: Dustin Mitchell Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCHERING CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Daniel Rolf Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GLENMARK GENERICS INC., USA
Represented By: Jennifer L. Eaton
Represented By: Richard Hooper Ottinger
Represented By: R. Brendan Fee
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jessica J. Taticchi
Represented By: Zachary M. Johns
Represented By: Dustin Mitchell Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCHERING PLOUGH CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Daniel Rolf Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: ZETIA (EZETIMIBE) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CESAR CASTILLO, INC., individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Represented By: William Hanes Monroe Jr.
Represented By: Marc Christian Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FWK HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: William Hanes Monroe Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Marc Christian Greco
Represented By: Erin Cathleen Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED
Represented By: William Hanes Monroe Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.
Represented By: William Hanes Monroe Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Urban
Represented By: Marc Christian Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?