George Howe v. Correction Enterprises
Defendant / Appellee: JERMAINE GRIFFIN, in his individual capacity, W. DAVID GUICE, in his individual capacity, THOMAS TERRANOVA, in his individual capacity, VIVIAN R. JOHNSON, in her individual capacity, JOSEPH HARRELL, in his individual capacity, FELIX TAYLOR, in his individual capacity, JESSE ROGERS, in his individual capacity, REGINA FEREBEE, in her individual capacity, KENNETH LASSITER, in his individual capacity, ROBERT LEON, in his individual capacity, NICOLE E. SULLIVAN, in her individual capacity, FAYE D. LASSITER, in her individual capacity, LORIS SUTTON, in her individual capacity, KAREN BROWN, in her individual capacity, STEVEN GARDNER, in his individual capacity, FRANK L. PERRY, in his individual capacity, WILLIAM DAVENPORT, in his individual capacity, CAPTAIN MARQUIS BETZ, in his individual capacity, ANNIE HARVEY, in her individual capacity, KATINA JORDAN, in her individual capacity, ERIK A. HOOKS, in his individual capacity, JEFFREY BAKER, in his individual capacity, LEARY M. CASPER, in his individual capacity, GEORGE SOLOMON, in his individual capacity, THOMAS ASHLEY, in his individual capacity, CARLTON RICHARDSON, in her individual capacity, RICHARD TURNER, in his individual capacity, COLBERT RESPASS, in his individual capacity, CORRECTION ENTERPRISES and LEON WILLIAMS, in his individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: GEORGE HOWE, Administrator of the Estate of Geoffrey Howe
Case Number: 20-2357
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix by a period of 30 days. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 03/18/2021. Response brief due 04/16/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000898986] [20-2357] MR [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:00 AM]
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 02/16/2021. Number of days granted: 15. Opening brief and appendix due 02/16/2021. Response brief due 03/17/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000887740] [20-2357] MR [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:06 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 Mediation conference data modified. [20-2357] LHP [Entered: 01/21/2021 08:45 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [20-2357] LHP [Entered: 01/19/2021 10:37 AM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David F. Kirby for George Howe. [1000882265] [20-2357] David Kirby [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:40 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by George Howe. [20-2357] Catharine Edwards [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:17 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by George Howe. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000882127] [20-2357] Catharine Edwards [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:05 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Catharine Edwards for George Howe. [1000882123] [20-2357] Catharine Edwards [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:02 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tamika L. Henderson for Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Karen Brown, Leary M. Casper, Correction Enterprises, William Davenport, Regina Ferebee, Steven Gardner, Jermaine Griffin, W. David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A. Hooks, Vivian R. Johnson, Katina Jordan, Faye D. Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L. Perry, Colbert Respass, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, George Solomon, Nicole E. Sullivan, Loris Sutton, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova, Richard Turner and Leon Williams. [1000881943] [20-2357] Tamika Henderson [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:38 AM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Karen Brown, Leary M. Casper, Correction Enterprises, William Davenport, Regina Ferebee, Steven Gardner, Jermaine Griffin, W. David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A. Hooks, Vivian R. Johnson, Katina Jordan, Faye D. Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L. Perry, Colbert Respass, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, George Solomon, Nicole E. Sullivan, Loris Sutton, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova, Richard Turner and Leon Williams. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000881942] [20-2357] Stephanie Brennan [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:35 AM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephanie A. Brennan for Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Karen Brown, Leary M. Casper, Correction Enterprises, William Davenport, Regina Ferebee, Steven Gardner, Jermaine Griffin, W. David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A. Hooks, Vivian R. Johnson, Katina Jordan, Faye D. Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L. Perry, Colbert Respass, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, George Solomon, Nicole E. Sullivan, Loris Sutton, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova, Richard Turner and Leon Williams. [1000881937] [20-2357] Stephanie Brennan [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:33 AM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to George Howe re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form, filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement form, appearance of counsel form(s) and disclosure form due from George Howe on 01/15/2021. [20-2357] MR [Entered: 01/12/2021 02:26 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/01/2021. Response Brief due 03/02/2021. [20-2357] MR [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:07 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00036-H. [20-2357] MR [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:05 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00036-H. Case manager: MRadday. [20-2357] MR [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: George Howe v. Correction Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERMAINE GRIFFIN, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. DAVID GUICE, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS TERRANOVA, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIVIAN R. JOHNSON, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH HARRELL, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FELIX TAYLOR, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE ROGERS, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGINA FEREBEE, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH LASSITER, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT LEON, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLE E. SULLIVAN, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FAYE D. LASSITER, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORIS SUTTON, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN BROWN, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN GARDNER, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK L. PERRY, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM DAVENPORT, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN MARQUIS BETZ, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANNIE HARVEY, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATINA JORDAN, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIK A. HOOKS, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY BAKER, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEARY M. CASPER, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE SOLOMON, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS ASHLEY, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLTON RICHARDSON, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD TURNER, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLBERT RESPASS, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTION ENTERPRISES
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEON WILLIAMS, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE HOWE, Administrator of the Estate of Geoffrey Howe
Represented By: David Fulghum Kirby
Represented By: Catharine E. Edwards
Represented By: Winston Scott Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?