Robert Weddington v. Detective Koons-Childrens
Defendant / Appellee: DETECTIVE KOONS-CHILDRENS
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT CLIFFORD WEDDINGTON
Case Number: 20-6177
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 27, 2020 Robert Weddington v. Detective Koons-Childrens

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert Clifford Weddington. [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/27/2020 04:32 PM]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Robert Clifford Weddington, #1270293. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robert Clifford Weddington. [1000688248] [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/21/2020 03:37 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Robert Clifford Weddington. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes (unsigned). [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/21/2020 03:35 PM]
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01680-TDC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:15 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/20/2020. [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/06/2020 08:48 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Robert Clifford Weddington. Informal Opening Brief due 03/02/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/06/2020 08:46 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Robert Clifford Weddington ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Robert Clifford Weddington. [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/06/2020 08:43 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01680-TDC. Case manager: CPoulsen. [20-6177] CP [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Weddington v. Detective Koons-Childrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE KOONS-CHILDRENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT CLIFFORD WEDDINGTON
Represented By: Robert Clifford Weddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?