Jonathan Brunson v. James Ammons, Jr.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JONATHAN EUGENE BRUNSON
Defendant / Appellee: JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR., Senior Resident Superior Court Judge
Case Number: 20-6216
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 19, 2020 Jonathan Brunson v. James Ammons, Jr.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-ct-03081-D. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:40 AM]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Jonathan Brunson, #0493187. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: J. Brunson; Warden. [1000699838] [20-6216] CT [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:32 AM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jonathan Eugene Brunson. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:26 AM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Jonathan Eugene Brunson. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:18 AM]
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Jonathan Eugene Brunson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:12 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/27/2020. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:46 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/09/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:42 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jonathan Eugene Brunson ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:39 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-ct-03081-D. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-6216] CT [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jonathan Brunson v. James Ammons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN EUGENE BRUNSON
Represented By: Jonathan Eugene Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR., Senior Resident Superior Court Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?