Chuck McCullough v. G. Dodkin
Respondent: ALAN WILSON
Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN G. DODKIN
Petitioner / Appellant: CHUCK EDWARD MCCULLOUGH
Case Number: 20-6271
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Chuck Edward McCullough. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/24/2020 02:25 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Chuck McCullough. Informal Opening Brief due 04/03/2020 [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:31 AM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court for follow-up on COA limited remand determination.. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:35 AM]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed remanding case for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Chuck McCullough. [1000690741] [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:45 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00388-MGL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case?No [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:22 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00388-MGL. Date notice of appeal filed: 02/20/2020. Case manager: JMoore. Did district court rule on COA? No. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Chuck McCullough v. G. Dodkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN G. DODKIN
Represented By: William Joseph Maye Esq.
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHUCK EDWARD MCCULLOUGH
Represented By: Chuck Edward McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALAN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?