David Gambino v. Frank Hershberger
Defendant / Appellee: TOM GERA, JANE DOE, Assistant Warden, 8 JOHN DOE OFFICERS AT FCI CUMBERLAND, SHANE SHEETZ, JODY AMERZUA, COUNSELOR SMITH, BLAINE SMITH, TEQUILA MCGAHEE, KRISTI CRITES, CARRIE HANSCOM, DENISE VANMETER, 4 JANE DOE MEDICAL PROVIDERS AT FCI CUMBERLAND, WARDEN STEWART, CAROL MILLER, LIEUTENANT EIRICH, BRETT DODD, C. TODD, FRANK HERSHBERGER, JOHN DOE, Representative for Mid Atlantic Office of BOP, P. BOCH and DR. MOHAMED MOUBAREK
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID A. GAMBINO
Case Number: 20-6591
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 19, 2020 David Gambino v. Frank Hershberger

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01701-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 06/19/2020. [1000760494] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: D. Gambino. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 06/19/2020 11:33 AM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01701-TDC. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000760492]. Mailed to: D. Gambino. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 06/19/2020 11:30 AM]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: David Gambino, #19757-055. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: D. Gambino. [1000737593] [20-6591] CT [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:25 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01701-TDC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:11 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by David A. Gambino. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:18 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by David A. Gambino. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:15 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: D. Gambino. Informal Opening Brief due 05/26/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:25 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David A. Gambino ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: D. Gambino. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:22 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 05/13/2020. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:58 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01701-TDC. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-6591] CT [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Gambino v. Frank Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOM GERA
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 8 JOHN DOE OFFICERS AT FCI CUMBERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANE SHEETZ
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JODY AMERZUA
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNSELOR SMITH
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLAINE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEQUILA MCGAHEE
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTI CRITES
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARRIE HANSCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE VANMETER
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 4 JANE DOE MEDICAL PROVIDERS AT FCI CUMBERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN STEWART
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL MILLER
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT EIRICH
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRETT DODD
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. TODD
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK HERSHBERGER
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Representative for Mid Atlantic Office of BOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: P. BOCH
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MOHAMED MOUBAREK
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID A. GAMBINO
Represented By: David A. Gambino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?