Francois Toure v. Russell Hott
Respondent / Appellee: FIELD OFFICE DIR. RUSSELL HOTT, in his official capacity as Washington Field Office Director, of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, COLONEL PAUL PERRY, in his official capacity as Superintendent, Caroline Detention Facility, JEFFERY CRAWFORD, in his official capacity as Warden, Farmville Detention Center, Immigration Centers of America, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, in his official capacity as Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of the U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U. S. BUREAU OF IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Petitioner / Appellant: FRANCOIS TOURE, UMMY MOHAMED, SISIRA KUMARA KUMARAGAMAGE DON and MELVIN CASTRO
Case Number: 20-6695
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 BRIEF by Matthew T. Albence, Jeffery Crawford, Russell Hott and U. S. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. [1000770627] [20-6695] Archith Ramkumar [Entered: 07/07/2020 04:09 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 25 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kristin Donovan for Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. [1000765724] [20-6695] Kristin Donovan [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:50 PM]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 07/07/2020. Reply brief due 07/21/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000752164] [20-6695] AW [Entered: 06/05/2020 04:33 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 23 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to accelerate case processing. [ # 15 ] Copies to all parties. [1000752130] [20-6695] AW [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:56 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amber Qureshi for Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. [1000751376] [20-6695] Amber Qureshi [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:58 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 Corrected BRIEF by Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000748724] [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 06/01/2020 10:50 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000748416] [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/29/2020 06:46 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MEMORANDUM OPENING BRIEF by Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. [20-6695]--[Edited 06/01/2020 by AW--see correction at ecf #21] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/29/2020 06:44 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY by Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Melvin Castro, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure to response [ # 17 ], Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 15 ].. [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/26/2020 05:57 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Matthew T. Albence, Jeffery Crawford, Russell Hott and U. S. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 15 ], notice requesting response [ # 16 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-6695] Archith Ramkumar [Entered: 05/26/2020 10:53 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE ISSUED to Matthew T. Albence, Jeffery Crawford, Russell Hott, Paul Perry and U. S. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 15 ]Response due: 05/26/2020 by 2pm.[1000744148]. [20-6695] AW [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:14 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed, Francois Toure and Melvin Castro to Expedite the briefing schedule.. Date and method of service: 05/21/2020 ecf. [1000743791] [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/21/2020 05:07 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000741970] [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/19/2020 11:39 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed, Francois Toure and Melvin Castro. [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/19/2020 11:38 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kasey L. Hoare for Jeffery Crawford. [1000741519] [20-6695] Kasey Hoare [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:51 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/29/2020. Response Brief due 07/27/2020 [20-6695] AW [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:23 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Granville C. Warner for Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. [1000740599] [20-6695] Granville Warner [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:11 AM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Russell Hott, Matthew T. Albence and U. S. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000739881] [20-6695] Archith Ramkumar [Entered: 05/15/2020 12:55 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew J. Mezger for Matthew T. Albence, Russell Hott and U. S. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. [1000739679] [20-6695] Matthew Mezger [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:09 AM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Archith Ramkumar for Matthew T. Albence, Russell Hott and U. S. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. [1000739659] [20-6695] Archith Ramkumar [Entered: 05/15/2020 09:46 AM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patricia Bugg Turner for Jeffery Crawford. [1000739295] [20-6695] Patricia Turner [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:28 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeffery Crawford. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000739231] [20-6695] John Erbach [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:34 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John Michael Erbach for Jeffery Crawford. [1000739227] [20-6695] John Erbach [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:31 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sirine Shebaya for Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. [1000738436] [20-6695] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:30 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adina Bassin Appelbaum for Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed and Francois Toure. [1000738382] [20-6695] Adina Appelbaum [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:01 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000738325-2 ] habeas immigration case Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00395-LO-JFA. Mailed to: Attorneys: Donovan, Hoare, Qureshi. [20-6695] AW [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:42 AM]
May 13, 2020 Habeas corpus immigration case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00395-LO-JFA. Date notice of appeal filed: 05/08/2020. Case manager: AWalker. [20-6695] AW [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Francois Toure v. Russell Hott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: FIELD OFFICE DIR. RUSSELL HOTT, in his official capacity as Washington Field Office Director, of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Matthew James Mezger
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: William K. Lane III
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: William Charles Peachey
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: COLONEL PAUL PERRY, in his official capacity as Superintendent, Caroline Detention Facility
Represented By: William K. Lane III
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: William Charles Peachey
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JEFFERY CRAWFORD, in his official capacity as Warden, Farmville Detention Center, Immigration Centers of America
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: John Michael Erbach
Represented By: Kasey Leigh Hoare
Represented By: William K. Lane III
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: William Charles Peachey
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, in his official capacity as Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of the U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Matthew James Mezger
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: William K. Lane III
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: William Charles Peachey
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: U. S. BUREAU OF IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Matthew James Mezger
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: William K. Lane III
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: William Charles Peachey
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FRANCOIS TOURE
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Kristin Donovan
Represented By: Amber Qureshi
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Amber Nasir Qureshi
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: UMMY MOHAMED
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Kristin Donovan
Represented By: Amber Qureshi
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Amber Nasir Qureshi
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SISIRA KUMARA KUMARAGAMAGE DON
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Kristin Donovan
Represented By: Amber Qureshi
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Amber Nasir Qureshi
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MELVIN CASTRO
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Kristin Donovan
Represented By: Amber Qureshi
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Amber Nasir Qureshi
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?