Curtis Brooks v. Harold Clarke
Respondent / Appellee: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director- V.D.O.C.
Petitioner / Appellant: CURTIS RAY BROOKS
Case Number: 20-6926
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [7]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Brooks. [1000779390] [20-6926] TF [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:09 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Curtis Ray Brooks to appoint/assign counsel. [1000778517] [20-6926] TF [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:13 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Curtis Ray Brooks. [20-6926] TF [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:11 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Curtis Ray Brooks. [20-6926] TF [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:09 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Curtis Ray Brooks. [20-6926] TF [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:29 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00595-LMB-TCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case?N/A [20-6926] TF [Entered: 06/29/2020 04:52 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 FEE NOTICE issued to Curtis Ray Brooks - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 07/24/2020 Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00595-LMB-TCB. Mailed to: Brooks. [20-6926] TF [Entered: 06/24/2020 12:31 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Brooks. Informal Opening Brief due 07/20/2020 [20-6926] TF [Entered: 06/24/2020 12:28 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/08/2020. [20-6926] TF [Entered: 06/24/2020 12:24 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00595-LMB-TCB. Date notice of appeal filed: 06/22/2020. Case manager: TFischer. Did district court rule on COA? No. [20-6926] TF [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Curtis Brooks v. Harold Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director- V.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CURTIS RAY BROOKS
Represented By: Curtis Ray Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?