Darrell Goss v. Bryan Stirling
Defendant / Appellee: CANTEEN MANAGER GEORGIA YELDELL, BRYAN P. STIRLING, JENNIFER FRANKLIN, Mailroom Director, STEPHANIE MARSHALL, SERGEANT WARREN PEEK, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LIEUTENANT CLARISSA JONES, THOMAS ROBERTSON, DEBORAH RICHTER, WILLIE SMITH, OFFICER STANLEY TERRY, JUANITA MOSS, ALYSON GLADWELL, CARLOS RIVERA, Officer, VERDEIA HALL, Corporal, CHAPLAIN NEDENIA PARKER-BARBER and CHARLES CROSBY, Officert
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARRELL L. GOSS
Case Number: 20-7835
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Darrell L. Goss. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 02/02/2021 01:55 PM]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to proceed PLRA [13] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Darrell Goss, 305517. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Darrell Goss. [1000884149] [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 01/20/2021 04:19 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Darrell L. Goss. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 01/20/2021 04:00 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Darrell L. Goss. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:49 PM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Charles Crosby and Carlos Rivera. [20-7835] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 01/11/2021 02:42 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Darrell L. Goss re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Darrell Goss. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 01/07/2021 01:08 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert D. Garfield for Charles Crosby and Carlos Rivera. [1000873679] [20-7835] Robert Garfield [Entered: 12/30/2020 05:11 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carlos Rivera. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000873583] [20-7835] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:10 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles Crosby. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000873580] [20-7835] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:09 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew F. Lindemann for Charles Crosby and Carlos Rivera. [1000873578] [20-7835] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:08 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Darrell L. Goss. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:16 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Darrell Goss. Informal Opening Brief due 01/11/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:28 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Darrell L. Goss ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Darrell Goss. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:26 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-03245-BHH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:25 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-03245-BHH. Case manager: JMoore. [20-7835] JHM [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darrell Goss v. Bryan Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CANTEEN MANAGER GEORGIA YELDELL
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN P. STIRLING
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER FRANKLIN, Mailroom Director
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE MARSHALL
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT WARREN PEEK
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES WILLIAMS
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT CLARISSA JONES
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS ROBERTSON
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH RICHTER
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIE SMITH
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER STANLEY TERRY
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUANITA MOSS
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALYSON GLADWELL
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLOS RIVERA, Officer
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERDEIA HALL, Corporal
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAPLAIN NEDENIA PARKER-BARBER
Represented By: Christy L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES CROSBY, Officert
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRELL L. GOSS
Represented By: Darrell L. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?