Deborah Anderson v. Bank of New York Mellon Corp.
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION and UNKNOWN, Mortgage Creditor
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEBORAH MARRINER ANDERSON
Case Number: 21-1263
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Deborah Marriner Anderson for: failure to file informal brief Due. Mailed to: Anderson. [21-1263 TF [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:57 AM]
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [9] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Anderson. [1000923043] [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/25/2021 01:26 PM]
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Deborah Marriner Anderson. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/25/2021 01:25 PM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000917292] [21-1263] Andrew Narod [Entered: 03/16/2021 04:55 PM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew J. Narod for Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. [1000916321] [21-1263] Andrew Narod [Entered: 03/15/2021 04:37 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court record (paper) requested? N/A. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/12/2021 11:30 AM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00654-GLR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/12/2021 11:30 AM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Anderson. Informal Opening Brief due 04/05/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:31 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Deborah Marriner Anderson - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 04/09/2021 Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00654-GLR. Mailed to: Anderson. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:29 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/24/2021. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:26 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: :20-cv-00654-GLR. Case manager: TFischer. [21-1263] TF [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Deborah Anderson v. Bank of New York Mellon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN, Mortgage Creditor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBORAH MARRINER ANDERSON
Represented By: Deborah Marriner Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?