Alessandro Gravina v. Xavier Becerra
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and XAVIER BECERRA, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALESSANDRO GRAVINA
Case Number: 21-1393
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/14/2021. Response brief due 07/12/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000949466] [21-1393] AW [Entered: 05/10/2021 03:44 PM]
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alessandro Gravina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000945031] [21-1393] Dionna Lewis [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:58 PM]
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dionna Maria Lewis for Alessandro Gravina. [1000945030] [21-1393] Dionna Lewis [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:57 PM]
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-1393] LHP [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:00 PM]
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Alessandro Gravina re: filing of appearance form and disclosure form. Appearance form and Disclosure form due on 05/06/2021 on behalf of Dionna Maria Lewis. [21-1393] AW [Entered: 05/03/2021 08:57 AM]
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kelly Marzullo for Xavier Becerra. [1000940126] [21-1393] Kelly Marzullo [Entered: 04/26/2021 09:55 AM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alessandro Gravina. [21-1393] Dionna Lewis [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:58 PM]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed substituting party Xavier Becerra for Alex M. Azar, II. Copies to all parties. [1000932272] [21-1393] AW [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:13 PM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/24/2021. Response Brief due 06/21/2021. [21-1393] AW [Entered: 04/12/2021 09:07 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-02993-PX. [21-1393] AW [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:57 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-02993-PX. Case manager: AWalker. [21-1393] AW [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alessandro Gravina v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALESSANDRO GRAVINA
Represented By: Dionna Maria Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?