David Meyers v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID MEYERS
Defendant / Appellee: ANDREW SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 21-1485
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Number of days granted: 30. PLRA documents due 07/19/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Meyers. [1000962717] [21-1485] KH [Entered: 06/03/2021 08:28 AM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by David Meyers in 21-1485, 21-6657, 21-1486, 21-6659, 21-6660 to extend filing time for for PLRA applications. [1000962716] [21-1485, 21-1486, 21-6657, 21-6659, 21-6660] KH [Entered: 06/03/2021 08:27 AM]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 4 ] Number of days granted: 21. PLRA documents due 06/17/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Meyers. [1000959156] [21-1485] KH [Entered: 05/27/2021 12:11 PM]
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by David Meyers in 21-6657, 21-1485, 21-1486, 21-6659, 21-6660 to extend filing time for PLRA applications. [1000959126] [21-6657, 21-6659, 21-6660, 21-1486, 21-1485] KH [Entered: 05/27/2021 11:44 AM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by David Meyers. [21-1485] KH [Entered: 05/27/2021 11:24 AM]
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David Meyers ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. [21-1485] KH [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:36 PM]
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00657-AWA-RJK. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-1485] KH [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:35 PM]
April 28, 2021 Social Security case docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00657-AWA-RJK. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/14/2021. Case manager: KHancock. [21-1485] KH [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Meyers v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID MEYERS
Represented By: David Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sean Douglas Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?