Rossi Wade v. Truist Bank
Defendant / Appellee: MAURICE STEWARD, Branch Manager, JODI MEADOWS, Operations Manager, THOMAS N. THOMPSON, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, CYNTHIA WILLIAMS, Executive Manager, THOMAS E. SKAINS, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, SUNTRUST BANK AND BB&T MERGER,, JENNIFER S. BANNER, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, BRUCE L. TANNER, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, STEPHON CUMBERBATCH, Branch Manager, SUNTRUST HOLDINGS, CHARLES A. PATTON, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, SUNTRUST CORP., KELLY S. KING, Truist Bank's Chairman & CEO, LINNIE M. HAYNESWORTH, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, DALLAS S. CLEMENT, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, PATRICK C. GRANEY, III, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, DONNA S. MOREA, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, NIDO R. QUEBEIN, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, AGNES BUNDY SCALAN, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, TRUIST BANK, CHRISTINE SEARS, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, DAVID M. RATCLIFFE, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, EASTER A. MAYNARD, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, STEVEN C. VOORHEES, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, ANNA R. CABLIK, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, PAUL R. GARCIA, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, SUNTRUST BANK, K. DAVID BOYER, JR., Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors, WILLIAM H. ROGERS, Truist Bank's President & CEO, PAUL D. DONAHUE, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors and FRANK O. SCRUGGS, JR., Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROSSI WADE, & DAUGHTER (JANE DOE)
Case Number: 21-1570
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Jennifer S. Banner, K. David Boyer, Jr., Anna R. Cablik, Dallas S. Clement, Stephon Cumberbatch, Paul D. Donahue, Paul R. Garcia, Patrick C. Graney, III, Linnie M. Haynesworth, Kelly S. King, Easter A. Maynard, Jodi Meadows, Donna S. Morea, Charles A. Patton, Nido R. Quebein, David M. Ratcliffe, William H. Rogers, Agnes Bundy Scalan, Frank O. Scruggs, Jr., Christine Sears, Thomas E. Skains, Maurice Steward, SunTrust Bank, Suntrust Bank and BB&T Merger, SunTrust Corp., SunTrust Holdings, Bruce L. Tanner, Thomas N. Thompson, Truist Bank, Steven C. Voorhees and Cynthia Williams. [21-1570] Mary Zinsner [Entered: 06/14/2021 01:08 PM]
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-00656-GJH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-1570] RJL [Entered: 06/08/2021 05:07 PM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelly S. King, Jennifer S. Banner, K. David Boyer, Jr., Anna R. Cablik, Dallas S. Clement, Stephon Cumberbatch, Paul D. Donahue, Paul R. Garcia, Patrick C. Graney, III, Linnie M. Haynesworth, Easter A. Maynard, Jodi Meadows, Donna S. Morea, Charles A. Patton, Nido R. Quebein, David M. Ratcliffe, William H. Rogers, Agnes Bundy Scalan, Frank O. Scruggs, Jr., Christine Sears, Thomas E. Skains, Maurice Steward, Bruce L. Tanner, Thomas N. Thompson, Steven C. Voorhees and Cynthia Williams. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000964149] [21-1570] Mary Zinsner [Entered: 06/04/2021 04:09 PM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 06/18/2021. [21-1570] RJL [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:51 PM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 RESTRICTED ACCESS DOCUMENT (court & party access only) filed by Ms. Rossi Wade. Document Title: Exhibits. Full document restriction required due to: other - personal data identifiers [1000963941] [21-1570] RJL [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:39 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Rossi Wade. [21-1570] RJL [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:37 PM]
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jennifer S. Banner, K. David Boyer, Jr., Anna R. Cablik, Dallas S. Clement, Stephon Cumberbatch, Paul D. Donahue, Paul R. Garcia, Patrick C. Graney, III, Linnie M. Haynesworth, Kelly S. King, Easter A. Maynard, Jodi Meadows, Donna S. Morea, Charles A. Patton, Nido R. Quebein, David M. Ratcliffe, William H. Rogers, Agnes Bundy Scalan, Frank O. Scruggs, Jr., Christine Sears, Thomas E. Skains, Maurice Steward, Bruce L. Tanner, Thomas N. Thompson, Steven C. Voorhees and Cynthia Williams re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure form due 06/16/2021. [21-1570]--[Edited 06/01/2021 by RJL - docket text updated to reflect correct due date] RJL [Entered: 06/01/2021 10:25 AM]
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Truist Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000958296] [21-1570] Mary Zinsner [Entered: 05/26/2021 12:15 PM]
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Mailed to: Rossi Wade. [21-1570] RJL [Entered: 05/14/2021 11:43 AM]
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Rossi Wade. Informal Opening Brief due 06/07/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-1570] RJL [Entered: 05/12/2021 12:48 PM]
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-00656-GJH. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [21-1570]--[Edited 05/13/2021 by RJL- NOA filed date and caption updated] RJL [Entered: 05/12/2021 12:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rossi Wade v. Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAURICE STEWARD, Branch Manager
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JODI MEADOWS, Operations Manager
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS N. THOMPSON, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA WILLIAMS, Executive Manager
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS E. SKAINS, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNTRUST BANK AND BB&T MERGER,
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER S. BANNER, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE L. TANNER, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHON CUMBERBATCH, Branch Manager
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNTRUST HOLDINGS
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES A. PATTON, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNTRUST CORP.
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY S. KING, Truist Bank's Chairman & CEO
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINNIE M. HAYNESWORTH, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALLAS S. CLEMENT, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK C. GRANEY, III, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNA S. MOREA, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NIDO R. QUEBEIN, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AGNES BUNDY SCALAN, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRUIST BANK
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE SEARS, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID M. RATCLIFFE, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EASTER A. MAYNARD, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN C. VOORHEES, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANNA R. CABLIK, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL R. GARCIA, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNTRUST BANK
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. DAVID BOYER, JR., Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM H. ROGERS, Truist Bank's President & CEO
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL D. DONAHUE, Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK O. SCRUGGS, JR., Member, Truist Bank Board of Directors
Represented By: Mary Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSSI WADE, & DAUGHTER (JANE DOE)
Represented By: Rossi Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?