Ronald Williams v. Ronald Williams, II
Plaintiff / Appellant: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS
Defendant / Appellee: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II
Case Number: 21-2020
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 17, 2021 Ronald Williams v. Ronald Williams, II

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 16 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 14 ] "definite and certain" portion of informal supplemental brief by Ronald Calvin Williams. [1001052168] [21-2020] AW [Entered: 11/03/2021 07:01 AM]
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 Letter by Ronald Calvin Williams . [1001052167] [21-2020] AW [Entered: 11/03/2021 06:57 AM]
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ronald Calvin Williams. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 11/01/2021 08:25 AM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ronald Calvin Williams. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 10/28/2021 04:06 PM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Ronald Calvin Williams, II. [21-2020] Benjamin Hintze [Entered: 10/28/2021 02:14 PM]
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE ISSUED re: tendered payment returned to Ronald Calvin Williams in paper form. Amount of payment: $505.00.. [21-2020] BAW [Entered: 10/20/2021 12:27 PM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ronald Calvin Williams. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:58 PM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ronald Calvin Williams. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001037699] [21-2020] AW [Entered: 10/07/2021 04:17 PM]
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ronald Calvin Williams, II. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001033529] [21-2020] Benjamin Hintze [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:33 PM]
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin P. Hintze for Ronald Calvin Williams, II. [1001033527] [21-2020] Benjamin Hintze [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:32 PM]
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00904-TDS-JLW. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-2020] DL [Entered: 09/24/2021 08:00 AM]
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 09/30/2021. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 09/22/2021 07:31 AM]
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 09/30/2021. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 09/16/2021 04:19 PM]
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Williams. Informal Opening Brief due 10/12/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 09/16/2021 04:11 PM]
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Ronald Calvin Williams - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/18/2021 Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00904-TDS-JLW. Mailed to: Williams. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 09/16/2021 04:02 PM]
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00904-TDS-JLW. Case manager: AWalker. [21-2020] AW [Entered: 09/16/2021 03:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ronald Williams v. Ronald Williams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Ronald Calvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Southerland
Represented By: Benjamin P. Hintze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?