Blue Flame Medical LLC v. Chain Bridge Bank, N.A.
Defendant: CHAIN BRIDGE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BLUE FLAME MEDICAL LLC
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN J. BROUGH and DAVID M. EVINGER
3Rd Party Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 21-2218
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 20, 2023 Blue Flame Medical LLC v. Chain Bridge Bank, N.A.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 71 ] Judgment Order , [ # 70 ] unpublished authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00658-LMB-IDD.[1001347015] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 04/11/2023 09:22 AM]
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00658-LMB-IDD. Entered on Docket Date: 03/20/2023. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001334411] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 03/20/2023 10:39 AM]
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 UNPUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00658-LMB-IDD. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001334399] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 03/20/2023 10:35 AM]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Attorney Kathleen Foley for Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218 and Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2219 terminated from case. Reason for termination: Order granting withdrawal. [1001307571] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 01/31/2023 12:25 PM]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER filed granting attorney Kathleen Foley's Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 67 ] New attorney appointed: No... Copies to all parties. [1001307563] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 01/31/2023 12:22 PM]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218 to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. If under L.R. 46(d), was client advised of right to file response within 7 days? N/A. Date and method of service: 01/31/2023 ecf. [1001307544] [21-2218, 21-2219] Kathleen Foley [Entered: 01/31/2023 12:08 PM]
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable G. Steven Agee, Pamela A. Harris and Lydia Kay Griggsby. Attorneys arguing case: Eric Franklin Citron for Appellant Blue Flame Medical LLC, Gary Andrew Orseck for Appellees John J. Brough, David M. Evinger and Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. and Alan E. Schoenfeld for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2218 and 21-2219. Courtroom Deputy: Rachel Phillips. [1001255875] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 10/27/2022 10:38 AM]
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for additional argument time [ # 62 ]. Total time granted: 5 additional minutes for Blue Flame Medical LLC. Copies to all parties. [1001255638] [21-2218, 21-2219] RP [Entered: 10/26/2022 05:08 PM]
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., John J. Brough and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 to [ # 62 ]. [1001253627] [21-2218, 21-2219] Gary Orseck [Entered: 10/24/2022 05:22 PM]
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE/ANSWER by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2218, 21-2219 to for additional argument time [ # 62 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001253595] [21-2218, 21-2219] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 10/24/2022 04:57 PM]
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218 for additional argument time Total time requested: 15 minutes.. Date and method of service: 10/24/2022 ecf. [1001253297] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 10/24/2022 02:20 PM]
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE ISSUED to Blue Flame Medical LLC and John J. Brough, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 requesting response to court inquiry. [1001250993] Response due: 10/24/2022. [21-2218, 21-2219] PSC [Entered: 10/19/2022 02:29 PM]
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Calendar notice sent. Nature of notice:Updated Entry and Covid Information. Date: 10/27/2022. Session Starting Time: 9:30 am. Check-in Time: 8:45-9:00 am. [1001238736] [21-2218, 21-2219] TS [Entered: 09/29/2022 11:49 AM]
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218, 21-2219. Counsel arguing: Eric F. Citron. Opening argument time: 15 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes. .. [1001225855] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 09/07/2022 03:02 PM]
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2218, 21-2219. Counsel arguing: Alan E. Schoenfeld. Opening argument time: 15 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes. .. [1001225794] [21-2218, 21-2219] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 09/07/2022 02:32 PM]
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., David M. Evinger and John J. Brough in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Counsel arguing: Gary A. Orseck. Answering argument time: 20 minutes. .. [1001225233] [21-2218, 21-2219] Gary Orseck [Entered: 09/07/2022 09:48 AM]
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 10/27/2022. Session Starting Time: 9:30. Check-in Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Forms due within 7 calendar days. [1001223901] [21-2218, 21-2219] JLC [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:20 PM]
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the October 25-28, 2022 argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of their briefs and appendices within 7 days. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 08/15/2022. [1001207147] [21-2218, 21-2219] JLC [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:55 PM]
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Notice issued re: motion to withdraw deemed moot. [1001187550] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 07/05/2022 08:31 AM]
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION by John J. Brough, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? N.. Date and method of service: 07/01/2022 ecf. [1001187010] [21-2218, 21-2219] Leslie Esbrook [Entered: 07/01/2022 11:05 AM]
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER filed granting attorney Donald Burke's Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 43 ] New attorney appointed: No. Copies to all parties. [1001130435] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 03/18/2022 11:32 AM]
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., David M. Evinger and John J. Brough in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? N.. Date and method of service: 03/18/2022 ecf. [1001130389] [21-2218, 21-2219] Donald Burke [Entered: 03/18/2022 10:47 AM]
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Receipt of paper copy of REPLY BRIEF filed at [ # 41 ] by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Number of pages: [27]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of Copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 03/17/2022. [1001137979] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 03/31/2022 10:36 AM]
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 BRIEF by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218. Type of Brief: REPLY. [1001127566] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 03/14/2022 09:47 PM]
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 BRIEF by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Type of Brief: REPLY. [1001127515] [21-2218, 21-2219] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 03/14/2022 05:31 PM]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 38 ] Number of days granted: 14. Reply brief (if any) due 03/14/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001113471] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:52 PM]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 to extend filing time for reply brief until March 14, 2022.. Date and method of service: 02/18/2022 ecf. [1001113428] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:22 PM]
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 BRIEF by Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., John J. Brough and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. [1001106008] [21-2218, 21-2219] Gary Orseck [Entered: 02/07/2022 08:48 PM]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 34 ]. Total words: 20,000. Copies to all parties. [1001086115] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 01/05/2022 09:11 AM]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 34 ]. Number of days granted: 17. Response brief due 02/07/2022. Copies to all parties. [1001084631] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 01/03/2022 03:33 PM]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION by Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., David M. Evinger and John J. Brough in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 to extend filing time for response brief until February 7, 2022. , to exceed length limitations for brief. Date and method of service: 01/03/2022 ecf. [1001084049] [21-2218, 21-2219] Gary Orseck [Entered: 01/03/2022 10:27 AM]
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Digital media retained by court. Content: JA Volume 7, and JA Volume 8. [1001081939] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 12/28/2021 03:14 PM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE ISSUED to Eric Franklin Citron in 21-2218 re: digital media. [1001080989] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 12/27/2021 02:39 PM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER filed sealing Joint Appendix Volumes 6 and 8. Copies to all parties. [1001080672] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 12/27/2021 10:23 AM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Mediation forms. [1001080381] [21-2218, 21-2219] MRB [Entered: 12/26/2021 10:20 AM]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 BRIEF by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001080217] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 12/22/2021 10:59 PM]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX VOLUME(S) (court access) by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218 . Digital media exhibit volume? Yes. Filed Ex parte: N. [1001080216] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 12/22/2021 10:40 PM]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218. Sealing Required: No. Description of document referenced by certificate: Joint appendix volumes 6 and 8. [1001080215] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 12/22/2021 10:36 PM]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JOINT APPENDIX by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218. Digital media exhibit volume? Yes. [1001080214] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 12/22/2021 10:33 PM]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 BRIEF by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001080210] [21-2218, 21-2219] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 12/22/2021 09:04 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Albinas J. Prizgintas for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001073242] [21-2218, 21-2219] Albinas Prizgintas [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:57 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marissa W. Medine for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001073240] [21-2218, 21-2219] Marissa Medine [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:55 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Margarita Botero for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001073236] [21-2218, 21-2219] Margarita Botero [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:53 PM]
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Blue Flame Medical LLC. [21-2218] Eric Citron [Entered: 11/22/2021 11:06 AM]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Blue Flame Medical LLC re: filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement due from Blue Flame Medical LLC on 11/22/2021. [21-2218] RJL [Entered: 11/17/2021 09:57 AM]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-2219, 21-2218] MRB [Entered: 11/17/2021 08:29 AM]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001057970] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 11/12/2021 05:48 PM]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218 re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Blue Flame Medical LLC on 11/15/2021. [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 11/12/2021 09:56 AM]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 15. Opening briefs and appendix due 12/22/2021. Response brief due 01/21/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001057358] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 11/12/2021 09:48 AM]
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION by Blue Flame Medical LLC and John J. Brough, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219 to extend filing time for Opening briefs, appendix, and response brief. until Opening briefs and appendix: December 22, 2021. Response brief: February 7, 2022... Date and method of service: 11/11/2021 ecf. [1001057105] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 11/11/2021 11:14 AM]
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKETING STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. [21-2219] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 11/10/2021 08:19 PM]
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001057069] [21-2219, 21-2218] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 11/10/2021 08:17 PM]
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alan Schoenfeld for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001057068] [21-2219, 21-2218] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 11/10/2021 08:15 PM]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew M. Madden for John J. Brough, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001054311] [21-2218, 21-2219] Matthew Madden [Entered: 11/05/2021 03:32 PM]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gary A. Orseck for Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., John J. Brough and David M. Evinger in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001054307] [21-2218, 21-2219] Gary Orseck [Entered: 11/05/2021 03:30 PM]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., David M. Evinger and John J. Brough in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001054306] [21-2218, 21-2219] Donald Burke [Entered: 11/05/2021 03:28 PM]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald Burke for Chain Bridge Bank, N.A., David M. Evinger and John J. Brough in 21-2218, Chain Bridge Bank, N.A. in 21-2219. [1001054302] [21-2218, 21-2219] Donald Burke [Entered: 11/05/2021 03:26 PM]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kathleen Foley for Blue Flame Medical LLC. [1001053446] [21-2218] Kathleen Foley [Entered: 11/04/2021 12:37 PM]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eric F. Citron for Blue Flame Medical LLC in 21-2218. [1001053440] [21-2218, 21-2219] Eric Citron [Entered: 11/04/2021 12:33 PM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 Customized BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Felicia Ellsworth, Zachary Ferguson, Steven Fisher, Carolyn Forstein, and Meredith Loretta. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Briefs and Appendix due 12/07/2021. Response Brief due 01/06/2022. [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 10/28/2021 10:06 AM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE ISSUED to Ms. Whitney Dougherty Russell in 21-2218 (L), and 21-2219 re: change of address. Mailed to: Felicia Ellsworth, Zachary Ferguson, Steven Fisher, Carolyn Forstein, and Meredith Loretta. [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 10/28/2021 10:00 AM]
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed consolidating case 21-2219 with 21-2218 (L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Felicia Ellsworth, Zachary Ferguson, Steven Fisher, Carolyn Forstein, and Meredith Loretta. [1001049055] [21-2218, 21-2219] RJL [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:50 AM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Mailed to: Felicia Ellsworth, Zachary Ferguson, Steven Fisher, Carolyn Forstein, and Meredith Loretta. [21-2218] RJL [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:40 AM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00658-LMB-IDD. Mailed to: Felicia Ellsworth, Zachary Ferguson, Steven Fisher, Carolyn Forstein, and Meredith Loretta.. [21-2218] RJL [Entered: 10/28/2021 08:06 AM]
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00658-LMB-IDD. Case manager: RachelLee. [21-2218] RJL [Entered: 10/27/2021 12:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Blue Flame Medical LLC v. Chain Bridge Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BLUE FLAME MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Steven Ronan Fisher
Represented By: Peter Hugh White
Represented By: Eric Franklin Citron
Represented By: Kathleen Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN J. BROUGH
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Zachary Nach Ferguson
Represented By: Carolyn Michele Forstein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Madden
Represented By: Gary Andrew Orseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID M. EVINGER
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Zachary Nach Ferguson
Represented By: Carolyn Michele Forstein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Madden
Represented By: Gary Andrew Orseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAIN BRIDGE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Zachary Nach Ferguson
Represented By: Carolyn Michele Forstein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Madden
Represented By: Gary Andrew Orseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Meredith Kathleen Loretta
Represented By: Whitney Dougherty Russell
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Margarita Botero
Represented By: Marissa Weil Medine
Represented By: Albinas Jehan Prizgintas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?