Michael Webb v. Anthony Fauci
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL DAVID WEBB, d/b/a Friends for Mike Webb, d/b/a Major Mike Webb for U.S. Congress (VA8), d/b/a Major Mike Webb for VA, d/b/a Major Mike Webb for APS Board
Defendant / Appellee: ANTHONY S. FAUCI, in official and individual capacities, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASE, ROCHELLE WALENSKY, in official and individual capacities, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, JANET WOODCOCK, in official and individual capacities, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, MOHAMMED NORMAN OLIVER, in official and individual capacities, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, PFIZER, INCORPORATED, MODERNATX, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., FACEBOOK, INC., UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, DONALD BEYER, in individual and official capacities, TIMOTHY M. KAINE, in official and individual capacities, MARK R. WARNER, in official and individual capacities, JUSTIN MICHAEL WILSON, in official and individual capacities, DIONNE HARDY, in official and individual capacities, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT & BUDGET, MARK R. HERRING, in official and individual capacities, OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, RALPH S. NORTHAM, in official and individual capacities, BIONTECH SE, JANSSEN GLOBAL SERVICES, LLC, JENNIFER R. PSAKI, in official and individual capacities, WHITE HOUSE COMMUNICATIONS AGENCY, V. MURTHY, JR., in official and individual capacities, OFFICE OF THE SURGEON GENERAL, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, in official and individual capacities, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, CHRISTINE E. WORMOTH, in official and individual capacities, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, XAVIER BECCERA, in official and individual capacities, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, TED BRITT FORD OF FAIRFAX, RICHARD D. HOLCOLM, in official and individual capacities, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, INGRID H. MORROY, in official and individual capacities, COMMISSIONER OF REVENUE FOR COUNTY OF ARLINGTON, CAPITAL INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC, A-1 TOWING OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, JOHN AND JANE DOES, GLENN YOUNGKIN, in official and individual capacities and JASON S. MIYARES, in official and individual capacities
Case Number: 21-2394
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed substituting party Jason S. Miyares for Mark R. Herring. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Mike Webb. [1001138134] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 03/31/2022 12:12 PM]
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed substituting party Glenn Youngkin for Ralph S. Northam. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Mike Webb. [1001128331] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2022 03:51 PM]
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari denied. 03/07/2022 [21-2394] EB [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:52 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 01/06/2022. 21-6868. [1001093944] [21-2394] EB [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:46 PM]
January 13, 2022 Filing 8 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00432-MHL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001091832] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:39 AM]
January 13, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Michael David Webb re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Mike Webb. [1001091826] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:35 AM]
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 01/04/2022. [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 12/21/2021 04:20 PM]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 3 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Mike Webb. [1001076192] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:25 PM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001076182] Informal Opening Brief due 01/10/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Mike Webb. [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:16 PM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00432-MHL. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001076102] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:10 AM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 DOCUMENT - Petition for Appeal / Informal Brief by Michael David Webb. [1001076190] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:24 PM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Michael David Webb. [1001076186] [21-2394] JSN [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Webb v. Anthony Fauci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL DAVID WEBB, d/b/a Friends for Mike Webb, d/b/a Major Mike Webb for U.S. Congress (VA8), d/b/a Major Mike Webb for VA, d/b/a Major Mike Webb for APS Board
Represented By: Michael David Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY S. FAUCI, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROCHELLE WALENSKY, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANET WOODCOCK, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOHAMMED NORMAN OLIVER, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PFIZER, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MODERNATX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FACEBOOK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD BEYER, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY M. KAINE, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK R. WARNER, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTIN MICHAEL WILSON, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIONNE HARDY, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT & BUDGET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK R. HERRING, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH S. NORTHAM, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BIONTECH SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANSSEN GLOBAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER R. PSAKI, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WHITE HOUSE COMMUNICATIONS AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: V. MURTHY, JR., in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE SURGEON GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE E. WORMOTH, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECCERA, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TED BRITT FORD OF FAIRFAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD D. HOLCOLM, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INGRID H. MORROY, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER OF REVENUE FOR COUNTY OF ARLINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPITAL INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A-1 TOWING OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN AND JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENN YOUNGKIN, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON S. MIYARES, in official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?