Robert Johnson v. Shirley Bennett
Defendant / Appellee: SHIRLEY BENNETT, BARBARA HARGROVE, MELISSA MORLE, MS. RAMACHE, Sergeant, CRISTAL VAUGHN and CLIFFORD CURTIS
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT H. JOHNSON
Case Number: 21-6186
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Robert H. Johnson re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Robert H. Johnson. [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:11 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 COURT ORDER filed denying motion for leave to proceed PLRA [4] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robert H. Johnson. [1000921633] [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:09 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-ct-03198-D. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:19 AM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Robert H. Johnson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:17 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/18/2021. [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:06 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Robert H. Johnson ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:02 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-ct-03198-D. Case manager: RSewell. [21-6186] RHS [Entered: 02/04/2021 08:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Johnson v. Shirley Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHIRLEY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA HARGROVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELISSA MORLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. RAMACHE, Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRISTAL VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD CURTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT H. JOHNSON
Represented By: Robert H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?