Marc Cason v. Corizon Health, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARC S. CASON, SR.
Defendant / Appellee: DR. HIRUY BISHAW, CORIZON HEALTH, INCORPORATED, MARYLAND DIVISION OF CORRECTIONS, DR. LAURENCE H. SCIPIO, DR. BOLAJI ONABAJO, DR. YONAS SISAY, DR. AYOKU OKETUNJI, BON SECOURS HOSPITAL and ASRESAHEGN GETACHEW
Case Number: 21-6290
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Marc S. Cason, Sr. re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Marc Cason. [21-6290] CB [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:11 PM]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed denying Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [6]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Marc Cason. [1000928117] [21-6290] CB [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:07 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Marc S. Cason, Sr. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes (filed at ECF 5). [21-6290] CB [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:49 AM]
March 20, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Samuel David Kinder Weiss for Marc S. Cason, Sr.. [1000919898] [21-6290] Samuel Weiss [Entered: 03/20/2021 06:35 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Marc S. Cason, Sr. [21-6290] TW [Entered: 03/22/2021 11:26 AM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Marc S. Cason, Sr. re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Mailed to: Marc Cason. [21-6290] CB [Entered: 03/18/2021 09:29 AM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to Marc S. Cason. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Marc Carson. [21-6290] CB [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:00 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-00692-PX. Case manager: CBennett. [21-6290] CB [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marc Cason v. Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARC S. CASON, SR.
Represented By: Marc S. Cason Sr.
Represented By: Samuel David Kinder Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. HIRUY BISHAW
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON HEALTH, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARYLAND DIVISION OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Lisa O'Mara Arnquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. LAURENCE H. SCIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. BOLAJI ONABAJO
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. YONAS SISAY
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. AYOKU OKETUNJI
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BON SECOURS HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASRESAHEGN GETACHEW
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?