Charles Head v. Asst. Warden Sample
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES HEAD
Defendant / Appellee: ASSISTANT WARDEN SAMPLE, WARDEN J. R. BELL, S. EIRICH, Sis Officer, OFFICER K. LILLER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICER CLARK, OFFICER DELARAMA, OFFICER WILMNER, OFFICER CANNON, OFFICER BOOTH and OFFICER BOCH
Case Number: 21-7434
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-01835-CCB. Mailed to: Charles Head. [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:30 PM]
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 6 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Charles Head. [1001045807] [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:29 PM]
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Charles Head to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [6]. Date and method of service: 10/21/2021. [1001045803] [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:27 PM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-01835-CCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/14/2021 09:08 AM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/21/2021. [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/07/2021 10:35 AM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Charles Head and Kimberly Phillips. Informal Opening Brief due 11/01/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/07/2021 10:34 AM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Charles Head ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days, 10/22/21. Mailed to: Charles Head and Kimberly Phillips. [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/07/2021 10:31 AM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-01835-CCB. Case manager: RachelLee. [21-7434] RJL [Entered: 10/07/2021 10:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Head v. Asst. Warden Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES HEAD
Represented By: Charles Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSISTANT WARDEN SAMPLE
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN J. R. BELL
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. EIRICH, Sis Officer
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER K. LILLER
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER CLARK
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER DELARAMA
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER WILMNER
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER CANNON
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER BOOTH
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER BOCH
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Shannon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?