Michael Fortuna v. Mr. Hudgins
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL RAY FORTUNA
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERT HUDGINS, Warden, DOCTOR ANDERSON, Doctor at Medical Services, MS. WILSON, Physicians Assistant and BREHMUR, Nurse at Medical Services
Case Number: 21-7677
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 12, 2022 Michael Fortuna v. Mr. Hudgins

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Michael Ray Fortuna. [1001076344] [21-7677] CT [Entered: 12/16/2021 03:12 PM]
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 12/30/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-7677] CT [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:23 AM]
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00072-JPB-JPM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001070137] [21-7677] CT [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:12 AM]
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00072-JPB-JPM. Case manager: CathyHerb. [1001070124] [21-7677] CT [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Fortuna v. Mr. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL RAY FORTUNA
Represented By: Michael Ray Fortuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT HUDGINS, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOCTOR ANDERSON, Doctor at Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. WILSON, Physicians Assistant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BREHMUR, Nurse at Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?