Career Counseling, Inc. v. Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: CAREER COUNSELING, INC., d/b/a Snelling Staffing Services, a South Carolina corporation, individually and as the representative of a class of similarly-situated persons
Defendant / Appellee: AMERIFACTORS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC and JOHN DOES 1-5
Case Number: 22-1119
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Career Counseling, Inc. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001125561] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/19/2022. Opening/Response Brief Due: 05/19/2022. Response/Reply Brief Due 06/21/2022. [22-1119, 22-1136] AW [Entered: 03/10/2022 05:24 PM]
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC.. [1001125331] [22-1119] Lauri Mazzuchetti [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:17 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC in 22-1119, 22-1136. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001114751] [22-1119, 22-1136] Lauri Mazzuchetti [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:24 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauri Mazzuchetti for Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC in 22-1119, 22-1136. [1001114746] [22-1119, 22-1136] Lauri Mazzuchetti [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:22 PM]
February 21, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John G. Felder, Jr. for Career Counseling, Inc. in 22-1119. [1001113776] [22-1119, 22-1136] John Felder [Entered: 02/21/2022 12:49 PM]
February 21, 2022 Filing 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Career Counseling, Inc... [1001113768] [22-1119] Glenn Hara [Entered: 02/21/2022 11:45 AM]
February 21, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Career Counseling, Inc. in 22-1119. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001113767] [22-1119, 22-1136] Glenn Hara [Entered: 02/21/2022 11:43 AM]
February 21, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Glenn L. Hara for Career Counseling, Inc. in 22-1119. [1001113766] [22-1119, 22-1136] Glenn Hara [Entered: 02/21/2022 11:40 AM]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed consolidating case 22-1136 with 22-1119 (L). Cross-appeal appellant: Career Counseling, Inc. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kelly, Smith. [1001108484] [22-1119, 22-1136] AW [Entered: 02/11/2022 06:41 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:16-cv-03013-JMC. Mailed to: Kelly, Smith. [1001105808] [22-1119] AW [Entered: 02/07/2022 04:16 PM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-03013-JMC. Case manager: AWalker. [1001105793] [22-1119] AW [Entered: 02/07/2022 04:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Career Counseling, Inc. v. Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAREER COUNSELING, INC., d/b/a Snelling Staffing Services, a South Carolina corporation, individually and as the representative of a class of similarly-situated persons
Represented By: John Gressette Felder Jr.
Represented By: Glenn Lorne Hara
Represented By: Ryan Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERIFACTORS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Knicely
Represented By: William Harding Latham
Represented By: Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti
Represented By: Whitney M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?