Jeremy Hudson v. Hampton Roads Shipping Association
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEREMY BREYON HUDSON
Defendant / Appellee: HAMPTON ROADS SHIPPING ASSOCIATION/ILA CONTRACT BOARD and ILA
Case Number: 22-2144
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-00464-AWA-DEM. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001272281] [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 10:23 AM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court in 22-2143, 22-2144. [1001271869] Due: 12/07/2022. [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/23/2022 03:02 PM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeremy Breyon Hudson in 22-2143, 22-2144. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001271868] [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/23/2022 03:01 PM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Jeremy Breyon Hudson in 22-2143, 22-2144 to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 11/23/2022 US mail. [1001271864] [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/23/2022 03:00 PM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Jeremy Breyon Hudson in 22-2143, 22-2144. [1001271862] [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/23/2022 03:00 PM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jeremy Breyon Hudson in 22-2143, 22-2144. [1001271860] [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/23/2022 02:59 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court in 22-2143, 22-2144 [1001262000]. Due: 11/21/2022. [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:40 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jeremy Breyon Hudson. [1001261997] Informal Opening Brief due 12/01/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:39 PM]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER filed consolidating case 22-2144 with 22-2143. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jeremy Breyon Hudson. [1001261996] [22-2143, 22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:38 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-00466-AWA-DEM. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001261992] [22-2144] RP [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeremy Hudson v. Hampton Roads Shipping Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEREMY BREYON HUDSON
Represented By: Jeremy Breyon Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAMPTON ROADS SHIPPING ASSOCIATION/ILA CONTRACT BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ILA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?