Kenneth Sellman v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff / Appellant: KENNETH SELLMAN, husband and wife and NANCY SELLMAN, husband and wife
Defendant / Appellee: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 22-2145
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2023 Filing 22 Corrected BRIEF by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001291449] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 01/02/2023 02:19 PM]
January 1, 2023 Filing 21 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Corrected JOINT APPENDIX by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001291430] [22-2145]--[Edited 01/03/2023 by AW--document filed in error] Richard Monahan [Entered: 01/01/2023 02:24 PM]
December 30, 2022 Filing 20 Docket correction requested from Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Re: [ # 19 ] brief. Access to brief has been restricted to case participants. [1001291213] [22-2145] EB [Entered: 12/30/2022 02:22 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 19 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) BRIEF by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001290807] [22-2145]--[Edited 01/04/2023 by EB- See ECF 22] Richard Monahan [Entered: 12/29/2022 04:46 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT APPENDIX by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001290803] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 12/29/2022 04:43 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT APPENDIX by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001290801] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 12/29/2022 04:42 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT APPENDIX by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001290798] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 12/29/2022 04:40 PM]
November 29, 2022 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Claire Davis for Safeco Insurance Company of America. [1001273344] [22-2145] Mary Claire Davis [Entered: 11/29/2022 10:42 AM]
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001272846] [22-2145] LHP [Entered: 11/28/2022 04:18 PM]
November 28, 2022 Filing 13 CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. [1001272575] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 11/28/2022 01:35 PM]
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America. [1001272356] [22-2145] William Harter [Entered: 11/28/2022 11:07 AM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001269796] Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/03/2023. Response Brief due 02/02/2023 [22-2145] TF [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:40 PM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman.. [1001269774] [22-2145]--[Edited 11/28/2022 by EB- See ECF 13] Richard Monahan [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:30 PM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin Joseph Selep for Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. [1001269763] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:26 PM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 Attorney Elise Nicole McQuain for Safeco Insurance Company of America in 22-2145, Justin Joseph Selep for Nancy Sellman and Kenneth Sellman in 22-2145 terminated from case. Reason for termination: Not participating. [1001269175] [22-2145] EB [Entered: 11/21/2022 10:10 AM]
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001268454] [22-2145] William Harter [Entered: 11/18/2022 11:13 AM]
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William M. Harter for Safeco Insurance Company of America. [1001268448] [22-2145] William Harter [Entered: 11/18/2022 11:12 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James G. Bordas III for Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. [1001266058] [22-2145] James Bordas [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:08 PM]
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001263749] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 11/09/2022 04:14 PM]
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard A. Monahan for Kenneth Sellman and Nancy Sellman. [1001263748] [22-2145] Richard Monahan [Entered: 11/09/2022 04:12 PM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00192-JPB. Mailed to: Elise Nicole McQuain; Justin Joseph Selep. [1001262557] [22-2145] EB [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:44 AM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00192-JPB. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001262539] [22-2145] EB [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Sellman v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH SELLMAN, husband and wife
Represented By: James Graham Bordas III
Represented By: Richard Allen Monahan
Represented By: Justin Joseph Selep
Represented By: James G. Bordas III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY SELLMAN, husband and wife
Represented By: James Graham Bordas III
Represented By: Richard Allen Monahan
Represented By: Justin Joseph Selep
Represented By: James G. Bordas III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: William Michael Harter
Represented By: Elise Nicole McQuain
Represented By: Mary Claire Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?