Fredrick Herold, Jr. v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc
Plaintiff / Appellant: FREDRICK W. HEROLD, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INCORPORATED, BRADFORD E. BUGHER, KRISTINA HEROLD, JESSE B. HAMMOCK, PETER R. COTTER, PARKER GOODMAN GORDON & HAMMOCK, LLC, JESSE BELA HAMMOCK and PETER RUSSELL COTTER
Case Number: 22-2235
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 25 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Bradford E. Bugher, Peter Russell Cotter, Jesse Bela Hammock, Kristina Herold and Parker Goodman Gordon & Hammock, LLC. [1001302661] [22-2235] Mary Tolbert [Entered: 01/20/2023 07:20 PM]
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER filed granting Motions to proceed in forma pauperis [23],[7]. Copies to all parties. [1001299628] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 01/17/2023 12:36 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 23 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Fredrick W. Herold, Jr.. [1001299014] [22-2235] Fredrick Herold [Entered: 01/13/2023 10:14 PM]
January 10, 2023 Filing 22 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Fredrick W. Herold, Jr.. [1001296750] [22-2235] Fredrick Herold [Entered: 01/10/2023 10:38 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 21 Attorney Andrew Neil Knauss for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated and Bradford E. Bugher in 22-2235 terminated from case. Reason for termination: Not participating. [1001290763] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/29/2022 04:16 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Shirlie Norris Lake for Parker Goodman Gordon & Hammock, LLC, Jesse Bela Hammock and Peter Russell Cotter. [1001290363] [22-2235] Shirlie Lake [Entered: 12/29/2022 10:37 AM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jesse B. Hammock for Kristina Herold. [1001289398] [22-2235] Peter Cotter [Entered: 12/28/2022 07:15 AM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter R. Cotter for Kristina Herold. [1001288964] [22-2235] Peter Cotter [Entered: 12/27/2022 11:36 AM]
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 15 ] Number of days granted: 14. Informal Opening Brief due 01/10/2023. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Andrew Knauss. [1001288939] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/27/2022 11:21 AM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 16 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Kristina Herold, Jesse Hammock, Peter Cotter, and Parker Goodman Gordon & Hammock, LLC re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 12/30/2022 from Peter Russell Cotter, Jesse Bela Hammock and Shirlie Norris Lake. Mailed to: Andrew Knauss. [1001288915] [22-2235]--[Edited 12/27/2022 by KH - docket text modified.] KH [Entered: 12/27/2022 11:03 AM]
December 26, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Fredrick W. Herold, Jr. to extend filing time for informal opening brief until January 10, 2023.. Date and method of service: 12/26/2022 ecf. [1001288588] [22-2235] Fredrick Herold [Entered: 12/26/2022 08:45 PM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary H. Tolbert for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated and Bradford E. Bugher. [1001286996] [22-2235] Mary Tolbert [Entered: 12/20/2022 06:02 PM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jesse Hammock, Peter Cotter, and Parker Goodman Gordon & Hammock, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001286133] [22-2235]--[Edited 12/27/2022 by KH - docket text modified.] Shirlie Lake [Entered: 12/20/2022 09:07 AM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bradford E. Bugher. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001284090] [22-2235] John Murdock [Entered: 12/15/2022 03:01 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001284088] [22-2235] John Murdock [Entered: 12/15/2022 03:00 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John M. Murdock for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated and Bradford E. Bugher. [1001284085] [22-2235] John Murdock [Entered: 12/15/2022 02:59 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kristina Herold. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001283598] [22-2235] Peter Cotter [Entered: 12/15/2022 09:08 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 FEE NOTICE issued to Fredrick W. Herold, Jr. - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 01/13/2023. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00610-GLR. [1001283029] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/14/2022 01:12 PM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Fredrick W. Herold, Jr.. [1001282730] [22-2235] Fredrick Herold [Entered: 12/14/2022 10:18 AM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00610-GLR. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001277379] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:37 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001276780] Due: 12/19/2022. [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/05/2022 09:46 AM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001275535]. Due: 12/15/2022. [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/01/2022 03:02 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Peter R. Cotter, Jesse B. Hammock, Fredrick W. Herold Jr., Andrew Neil Knauss, Mary H. Tolbert. [1001275526] Informal Opening Brief due 12/27/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:51 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Fredrick W. Herold, Jr. - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 01/03/2023. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00610-GLR. Mailed to: Peter R. Cotter, Jesse B. Hammock, Fredrick W. Herold Jr., Andrew Neil Knauss, Mary H. Tolbert. [1001275521] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:43 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00610-GLR. Case manager: KHancock. [1001275445] [22-2235] KH [Entered: 12/01/2022 01:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fredrick Herold, Jr. v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FREDRICK W. HEROLD, JR.
Represented By: Fredrick W. Herold Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Mary H. Tolbert
Represented By: Andrew Neil Knauss
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Represented By: Mary Hirth Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADFORD E. BUGHER
Represented By: Andrew Neil Knauss
Represented By: Mary H. Tolbert
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Represented By: Mary Hirth Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTINA HEROLD
Represented By: Peter R. Cotter
Represented By: Jesse B. Hammock
Represented By: Peter Russell Cotter
Represented By: Jesse Bela Hammock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE B. HAMMOCK
Represented By: Shirlie Norris Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER R. COTTER
Represented By: Shirlie Norris Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARKER GOODMAN GORDON & HAMMOCK, LLC
Represented By: Shirlie Norris Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE BELA HAMMOCK
Represented By: Shirlie Norris Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER RUSSELL COTTER
Represented By: Shirlie Norris Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?