Alexandra Stefan v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALEXANDRA STEFAN
Defendant / Appellee: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-2272
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001298913] Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/22/2023. Response Brief due 03/24/2023. [22-2272] EB [Entered: 01/13/2023 04:21 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 14 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001293153] [22-2272] LHP [Entered: 01/04/2023 02:28 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by T. David Rheney for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. [1001289894] [22-2272] Ioannis Conits [Entered: 12/28/2022 01:34 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001289886] [22-2272] Ioannis Conits [Entered: 12/28/2022 01:27 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ioannis G. Conits for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. [1001289885] [22-2272] Ioannis Conits [Entered: 12/28/2022 01:26 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Debra Bull. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion for Summary Judgment- 11/14/2022. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Alexandra Stefan. Originating case number: 6:20-cv-01780-TMC. [1001289560] Transcript due from Debra Bull, Official Court Reporter on 03/06/2023. [22-2272] EB [Entered: 12/28/2022 09:54 AM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Alexandra Stefan for Debra Bull. [1001289518] [22-2272] Paul Landis [Entered: 12/28/2022 09:19 AM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 Docket correction requested from Alexandra Stefan. Re: [ # 7 ] transcript order. Access to transcript order has been restricted to case participants. [1001289474] [22-2272] EB [Entered: 12/28/2022 08:50 AM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Alexandra Stefan for Debra Bull. [1001288973] [22-2272]--[Edited 12/28/2022 by EB- See ECF 9] Paul Landis [Entered: 12/27/2022 11:43 AM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 Docket correction requested from Alexandra Stefan. Mailed to: Ioannis George Conits. [1001288107] [22-2272] EB [Entered: 12/22/2022 11:33 AM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alexandra Stefan.. [1001288065] [22-2272] Paul Landis [Entered: 12/22/2022 11:07 AM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alexandra Stefan. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001288063] [22-2272] Paul Landis [Entered: 12/22/2022 11:06 AM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul S. Landis for Alexandra Stefan. [1001288062] [22-2272] Paul Landis [Entered: 12/22/2022 11:05 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 6:20-cv-01780-TMC. Mailed to: Ioannis George Contis. [1001282640] [22-2272] EB [Entered: 12/14/2022 09:41 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:20-cv-01780-TMC. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001282631] [22-2272] EB [Entered: 12/14/2022 09:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alexandra Stefan v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEXANDRA STEFAN
Represented By: Paul Swain Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ioannis George Conits
Represented By: Theodore David Rheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?