Ray Hale v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.
Plaintiff / Appellant: RAY LEWIS HALE
Defendant / Appellee: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 22-2291
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Ray Lewis Hale re: initial notice appearance forms, docketing Statement & Disclosure forms. [1001310009] [22-2291] RHS [Entered: 02/03/2023 09:14 AM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Guy M. Harbert, III for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. [1001290674] [22-2291] Guy Harbert [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:10 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001290659] [22-2291] David Berry [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:01 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David R. Berry for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. [1001290657] [22-2291] David Berry [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:01 PM]
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00049-JPJ-PMS.. [1001287231] [22-2291] RHS [Entered: 12/21/2022 10:22 AM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00049-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: RSewell. [1001286650] [22-2291] RHS [Entered: 12/20/2022 12:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ray Hale v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAY LEWIS HALE
Represented By: Michael Allen Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Guy M. Harbert III
Represented By: David Robert Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?