Jesse Graham v. Melissa Evans
Defendant: PAZAVAR C. PRIEST, JENNIFER L. WALSH, KIMBERLY GRANDE and LT. FRINKS
Plaintiff / Appellant: JESSE THOMAS GRAHAM
Defendant / Appellee: MELISSA EVANS
Case Number: 22-7191
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVICE LIST by Jesse Thomas Graham. [1001283039] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 12/14/2022 01:17 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 10 Exhibit(s) [ # 9 ] informal opening brief by Jesse Thomas Graham. [1001280783] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 12/12/2022 10:50 AM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jesse Thomas Graham. [1001279729] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 12/08/2022 03:29 PM]
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jesse Thomas Graham. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No. [1001270709] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 11/22/2022 02:20 PM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jesse Thomas Graham re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Jesse Thomas Graham, #0151891, COLUMBUS CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1255 Prison Camp Road, Whiteville, NC 28472. [1001263044] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:20 PM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jesse Thomas Graham. [1001262968] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 11/08/2022 03:33 PM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-ct-03102-D. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001256774] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 10/28/2022 01:09 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001248716]. Due: 10/31/2022. [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 10/17/2022 11:09 AM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jesse Thomas Graham, #0151891, COLUMBUS CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1255 Prison Camp Road, Whiteville, NC 28472. [1001248712] Informal Opening Brief due 11/10/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 10/17/2022 11:06 AM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jesse Thomas Graham ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jesse Thomas Graham, #0151891, COLUMBUS CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1255 Prison Camp Road, Whiteville, NC 28472. [1001248704] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 10/17/2022 11:04 AM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-ct-03102-D. Case manager: NaeemahSims. [1001248680] [22-7191] NRS [Entered: 10/17/2022 10:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jesse Graham v. Melissa Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESSE THOMAS GRAHAM
Represented By: Jesse Thomas Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELISSA EVANS
Represented By: Alex Ryan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAZAVAR C. PRIEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER L. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY GRANDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. FRINKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?