Tori Neal v. State of North Carolina
Petitioner / Appellant: TORI NEAL
Respondent / Appellee: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA and ERIK A. HOOKS
Case Number: 22-7192
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 20, 2023 Tori Neal v. State of North Carolina

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 DOCUMENT filed by Tori Neal - objection to Rule 45 notice [ # 6 ]. [1001280217] [22-7192] CP [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:15 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Tori Neal. [1001280214] [22-7192] CP [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:12 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Tori Neal. [1001277341] [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:26 PM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Tori Neal. [1001271640] [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:03 AM]
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Tori Neal re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Tori Neal. [1001268825] [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 11/18/2022 04:08 PM]
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00247-WO-LPA. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case? No. [1001260654] [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 11/03/2022 04:05 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001249042]. Due: 10/31/2022. [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 10/17/2022 02:23 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001249037] Informal Opening Brief due 11/10/2022. Mailed to: Tori Neal. [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 10/17/2022 02:22 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Tori Neal - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/16/2022. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00247-WO-LPA. Mailed to: Tori Neal. [1001249029] [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 10/17/2022 02:20 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00247-WO-LPA. Date notice of appeal filed: 10/13/2022. Case manager: JeffNeal. Did district court rule on COA? No. [1001248897] [22-7192] JSN [Entered: 10/17/2022 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tori Neal v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TORI NEAL
Represented By: Tori Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Caden William Hayes
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ERIK A. HOOKS
Represented By: Caden William Hayes
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?