Michael Hepstall v. US
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL LOUIS HEPSTALL
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 22-7257
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 Attorney Robert Sneed for US in 22-7257 terminated from case. Reason for termination: Not participating. [1001272425] [22-7257] RE [Entered: 11/28/2022 11:57 AM]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief and IFP application due 12/28/2022. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Michael Louis Hepstall. [1001270215] [22-7257] RE [Entered: 11/22/2022 09:46 AM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Michael Louis Hepstall to extend filing time for informal brief and ifp application for 30 days. [1001270207] [22-7257] RE [Entered: 11/22/2022 09:44 AM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marshall Prince for US. [1001257376] [22-7257] Marshall Prince [Entered: 10/31/2022 10:41 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-00877-JD. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001256623] [22-7257] RE [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:59 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001256591]. Due: 11/14/2022. [22-7257] RE [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:39 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Michael Hepstall. [1001256586] Informal Opening Brief due 11/21/2022 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-7257] RE [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:37 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Michael Louis Hepstall - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/28/2022 Originating case number: 8:20-cv-00877-JD. Mailed to: Michael Hepstall. [1001256577] [22-7257] RE [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:24 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-00877-JD. Case manager: REdwards. [1001256571] [22-7257] RE [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Hepstall v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL LOUIS HEPSTALL
Represented By: Michael Louis Hepstall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Marshall Prince II
Represented By: Robert Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?