Lamar Dorsey v. Sgt. Bolen
Defendant: WEST VIRGINIA DIVISION OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: LAMAR NASHAWN DORSEY
Defendant / Appellee: SERGEANT BOLEN, Correctional Officer and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 22-7317
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 15 ] Number of days granted: 1. informal response due 01/02/2023. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Lamar Dorsey. [1001296140] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 01/10/2023 10:54 AM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Lamar Nashawn Dorsey. [1001296145] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 01/10/2023 10:58 AM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Lamar Nashawn Dorsey to extend filing time for informal reply brief until January 2, 2023. [1001296135] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 01/10/2023 10:52 AM]
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Sergeant Bolen. [1001287467] [22-7317] John Fuller [Entered: 12/21/2022 02:08 PM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 13 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Lamar Nashawn Dorsey. [1001281572] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:15 AM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 12 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Lamar Nashawn Dorsey. [1001279695] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 12/08/2022 03:12 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 11 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Lamar Nashawn Dorsey. [1001279692] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 12/08/2022 03:11 PM]
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Lamar Dorsey #3507564. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Lamar Dorsey and PLRA custodian Warden, Attn: Accounting Office HUTTONSVILLE CORRECTIONAL CENTER P. O. Box 1 Huttonsville, WV 26273-0000. [1001277270] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 12/05/2022 03:54 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Lamar Nashawn Dorsey. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [1001277267] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 12/05/2022 03:51 PM]
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Suleiman Oko-ogua for Sergeant Bolen. [1001270636] [22-7317] John Fuller [Entered: 11/22/2022 01:38 PM]
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John P. Fuller for Sergeant Bolen. [1001270633] [22-7317] John Fuller [Entered: 11/22/2022 01:36 PM]
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sergeant Bolen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001270631] [22-7317] John Fuller [Entered: 11/22/2022 01:35 PM]
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-00222. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001270471] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 11/22/2022 11:38 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001266084]. Due: 11/29/2022. [22-7317] RE [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:29 PM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Lamar Dorsey. [1001266083] Informal Opening Brief due 12/09/2022 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-7317] RE [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:28 PM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Lamar Nashawn Dorsey ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Lamar Nashawn Dorsey. [1001266079] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:26 PM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-00222. Case manager: REdwards. [1001266075] [22-7317] RE [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lamar Dorsey v. Sgt. Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAMAR NASHAWN DORSEY
Represented By: Lamar Nashawn Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT BOLEN, Correctional Officer
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: Suleiman O. Oko-ogua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST VIRGINIA DIVISION OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?