Demond White v. Harold Clarke
Petitioner / Appellant: DEMOND ANTOINE WHITE
Respondent / Appellee: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Case Number: 23-6765
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 6, 2024 Demond White v. Chadwick Dotson

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis [10]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Desmond White. [1001436039] [23-6765] TW [Entered: 09/08/2023 04:04 PM]
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Demond Antoine White. [1001435941] [23-6765] TW [Entered: 09/08/2023 03:04 PM]
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Demond Antoine White re: failure to satisfy fee requirements. Mailed to: Demond White. [1001435672] [23-6765] TW [Entered: 09/08/2023 11:48 AM]
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed deferring action on motion for transcript at government expense filed by Appellant Demond Antoine White [ # 7 ]. Action deferred until: pending filing of the informal brief. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Demond White. [1001435668] [23-6765] TW [Entered: 09/08/2023 11:46 AM]
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION by Demond Antoine White for transcript at government expense. Date and method of service: 08/30/2023 US mail. [1001435366] [23-6765] TW [Entered: 09/08/2023 09:22 AM]
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Demond Antoine White. [1001433350] [23-6765] RP [Entered: 09/05/2023 03:37 PM]
August 17, 2023 Filing 5 RECORD ON APPEAL filed (paper form). Record Part: State Court Records, Comments: Total boxes: 1; Total Volumes: 4. Copy of record filed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00951-RDA-IDD. [1001422825] [23-6765] MEB [Entered: 08/17/2023 03:48 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001414360]. Due: 08/17/2023. [23-6765] MEB [Entered: 08/03/2023 11:13 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Demond White. [1001414357] Informal Opening Brief due 08/28/2023. [23-6765] MEB [Entered: 08/03/2023 11:10 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Demond Antoine White - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 09/05/2023. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00951-RDA-IDD. Mailed to: Demond White. [1001414353] [23-6765] MEB [Entered: 08/03/2023 11:08 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00951-RDA-IDD. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/28/2023. Case manager: MBeall. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [1001414350] [23-6765] MEB [Entered: 08/03/2023 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Demond White v. Harold Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DEMOND ANTOINE WHITE
Represented By: Demond Antoine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Elizabeth Kiernan Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?