Brian Farabee v. Sheriff of Dinwiddie County
Respondent: SHERIFF OF DINWIDDIE COUNTY, (successor or designee), CHADWICK DOTSON, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections, DEPARTMENT OF VIRGINIA STATE POLICE and SUPERINTENDENT OF MEHERRIN RIVER REGIONAL JAIL
Petitioner / Appellant: BRIAN DAMON FARABEE
Respondent / Appellee: NELSON SMITH, Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Behavioral Health and Development Services (DBHDS)
Case Number: 23-7037
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 15, 2024 Brian Farabee v. Sheriff of Dinwiddie County

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Brian Damon Farabee. [1001477218] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/21/2023 09:24 AM]
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 12/13/2023. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Brian Farabee, Laura Miller. [1001474511] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/15/2023 04:28 PM]
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Brian Damon Farabee to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 11/15/2023 US mail. [1001474504] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/15/2023 04:26 PM]
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 Document(s) re-sent to Laura Lee Miller on behalf of Nelson Smith. Which document(s)?. Re: [ # 7 ] Order. [1001473635] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/14/2023 03:49 PM]
November 14, 2023 Filing 9 Returned mail received from Nelson Smith re [ # 7 ] Order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? resent and included suite number [1001473566] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/14/2023 03:16 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001472424] Due: 11/27/2023. [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/13/2023 02:46 PM]
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [6] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Brian Farabee and Laura Miller. [1001466242] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/02/2023 08:47 AM]
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Brian Damon Farabee. [1001466233] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 11/02/2023 08:44 AM]
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 RECORD CORRECTION NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001462432] Due: 11/09/2023. [23-7037] DL [Entered: 10/26/2023 11:02 AM]
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 FEE NOTICE issued to Brian Damon Farabee - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/20/2023 Originating case number: 2:22-cv-00279-AWA-LRL. Mailed to: Brian Farabee and Laura Miller. [1001458123] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 10/19/2023 09:27 AM]
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001458121]. Due: 11/02/2023. [23-7037] DL [Entered: 10/19/2023 09:26 AM]
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Brian Farabee and Laura Miller. [1001458117] Informal Opening Brief due 11/13/2023 [23-7037] DL [Entered: 10/19/2023 09:23 AM]
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 2:22-cv-00279-AWA-LRL. Date notice of appeal filed: 10/16/2023. Case manager: DLett. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [1001458099] [23-7037] DL [Entered: 10/19/2023 09:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brian Farabee v. Sheriff of Dinwiddie County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: BRIAN DAMON FARABEE
Represented By: Brian Damon Farabee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SHERIFF OF DINWIDDIE COUNTY, (successor or designee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHADWICK DOTSON, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF VIRGINIA STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT OF MEHERRIN RIVER REGIONAL JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: NELSON SMITH, Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Behavioral Health and Development Services (DBHDS)
Represented By: Lynne Jones Blain
Represented By: Laura Lee Miller
Represented By: Leanna Catherine Minix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?