Jay Folse v. American Electric Power Service Corporation
Plaintiff: JAY FOLSE
Defendant: AMERICAN ELECTRIC POWER SERVICE CORPORATION, APPALACHIAN POWER COMPANY, PHILLIPS & JORDAN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES LLC, PHILLIPS AND JORDAN, INC. and PHILLIPS AND JORDAN HOLDING, LLC
Case Number: 24-1284
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jay Folse re: filing of disclosure form. [1001570970] [24-1284] TB [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:04 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jay Folse re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Jay Folse on 05/06/2024. [1001563100] [24-1284] TB [Entered: 05/03/2024 12:16 PM]
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ]. Number of days granted: 53. Informal Opening Brief due 06/21/2024 Copies to all parties. [1001554123] [24-1284] TB [Entered: 04/17/2024 01:57 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Jay Folse to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until June 21, 2024.. Date and method of service: 04/16/2024 ecf. [1001553670] [24-1284] Jay Folse [Entered: 04/16/2024 07:45 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Appalachian Power Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001551323] [24-1284] W. Sorrells [Entered: 04/11/2024 02:28 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Electric Power Service Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001551321] [24-1284] W. Sorrells [Entered: 04/11/2024 02:27 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by W. Bradley Sorrells for American Electric Power Service Corporation and Appalachian Power Company. [1001551260] [24-1284] W. Sorrells [Entered: 04/11/2024 01:21 PM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001547621]. Due: 04/18/2024. [24-1284] TB [Entered: 04/04/2024 11:00 AM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001547620] Informal Opening Brief due 04/29/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [24-1284] TB [Entered: 04/04/2024 10:59 AM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-00201. Case manager: TBarton. [1001547612] [24-1284] TB [Entered: 04/04/2024 10:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jay Folse v. American Electric Power Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY FOLSE
Represented By: Jay Folse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ELECTRIC POWER SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPALACHIAN POWER COMPANY
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS & JORDAN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS AND JORDAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS AND JORDAN HOLDING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?