Gerry Fowler, Sr. v. IRS
Plaintiff: GERRY W. FOWLER, SR.
Defendant: ZALES CORP. and INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 24-1443
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Jobs

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 23, 2024 Gerry Fowler, Sr. v. IRS
October 3, 2024 Gerry Fowler, Sr. v. IRS

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gerry W. Fowler, Sr. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No. [1001582530] [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 06/10/2024 03:58 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 8 DOCKETING FORMS NOTICE ISSUED to Gerry W. Fowler, Sr. re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Gerry W. Fowler Sr. 917 Jay Are Ct. Virginia Beach, VA 23462. [1001578210] [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:11 AM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED re: misrouted fee received/transmitted to VA Eastern District in paper form. Amount: $605.00. Mailed to: Gerry W. Fowler, Sr. 917 Jay Are Ct. Virginia Beach, VA 23462. [1001576939] [24-1443] SAB [Entered: 05/30/2024 02:37 PM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 6 Redacted version posted for informal opening brief. Reason not available through remote electronic access:personal data identifiers. [1001576190] [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 05/29/2024 04:15 PM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Gerry W. Fowler, Sr. [1001576187] [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 05/29/2024 04:12 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001569876]. Due: 05/30/2024. [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 05/16/2024 12:25 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Gerry W. Fowler Sr. 917 Jay Are Ct. Virginia Beach, VA 23462. [1001569873] Informal Opening Brief due 06/10/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 05/16/2024 12:18 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Gerry W. Fowler, Sr. - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 06/17/2024. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-00566-MSD-LRL. Mailed to: Gerry W. Fowler Sr. 917 Jay Are Ct. Virginia Beach, VA 23462. [1001569866] [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 05/16/2024 12:11 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-00566-MSD-LRL. Case manager: BevWashington. [1001569845] [24-1443] BAW [Entered: 05/16/2024 11:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gerry Fowler, Sr. v. IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZALES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERRY W. FOWLER, SR.
Represented By: Gerry W. Fowler Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?