James Wynn v. Annette Watkins Harris
Plaintiff: JAMES ERIC WYNN
Defendant: ANNETTE D. WATKINS HARRIS
Case Number: 24-2207
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil (Rico)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Eric Wynn. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001717012] [24-2207] EB [Entered: 02/06/2025 02:04 PM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 11 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Eric Wynn. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001715031] [24-2207]--[Edited 02/06/2025 by EB- See ECF 12] EB [Entered: 02/04/2025 03:29 PM]
January 27, 2025 Filing 10 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to James Eric Wynn re: filing of disclosure. form Case may be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: James Eric Wynn. [1001708917] [24-2207] EB [Entered: 01/27/2025 10:41 AM]
January 14, 2025 Filing 9 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to James Eric Wynn re: failure to satisfy fee requirements. Mailed to: James Eric Wynn. [1001702567] [24-2207] EB [Entered: 01/14/2025 04:12 PM]
December 31, 2024 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by James Eric Wynn. [1001696824] . [24-2207] EB [Entered: 01/03/2025 11:05 AM]
December 31, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED re: tendered payment returned to James Eric Wynn in paper form. Amount of payment: $605.00. Mailed to: James Eric Wynn P. O. Box 862 Hartsdale, NY 10530. [1001694536] [24-2207] MJP [Entered: 12/31/2024 03:17 PM]
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to [ # 5 ] informal opening brief by James Eric Wynn. [1001693492] [24-2207] AW [Entered: 12/30/2024 12:12 PM]
December 20, 2024 Filing 5 Document construed as INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by James Eric Wynn. [1001691037] [24-2207] AW [Entered: 12/20/2024 04:09 PM]
December 9, 2024 Filing 4 FEE NOTICE issued to James Eric Wynn - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 01/08/2025. Originating case number: 3:24-cv-00366-RCY. Mailed to: James Eric Wynn. [1001683593] [24-2207] EB [Entered: 12/09/2024 04:09 PM]
December 9, 2024 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001683238]. Due: 12/23/2024. [24-2207] EB [Entered: 12/09/2024 11:53 AM]
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: James Eric Wynn. [1001683236] Informal Opening Brief due 01/02/2025. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [24-2207] EB [Entered: 12/09/2024 11:52 AM]
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:24-cv-00366-RCY. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001683225] [24-2207] EB [Entered: 12/09/2024 11:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Wynn v. Annette Watkins Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ERIC WYNN
Represented By: James Eric Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE D. WATKINS HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?