Michael Owlfeather-Gorbey v. Mohamed Mubarek
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S. GORBEY
Defendant: MUBAREK, Doctor, TOM GERA, P.A., VANMETER, Nurse, S. EIRICH, HAMELTON, HSS and THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 24-6362
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Michael S. Gorbey. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [1001577665] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 05/31/2024 02:56 PM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 6 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Michael S. Gorbey re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Michael S. Gorbey. [1001575594] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 05/29/2024 09:31 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Michael S. Gorbey re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Michael S. Gorbey. [1001571433] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 05/20/2024 04:27 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 Returned mail received from Michael S. Gorbey re [ # 3 ] for failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? Will resend to Mr. Gobey at Oklahoma FTC [1001571428] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 05/20/2024 04:25 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Michael S. Gorbey re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Michael S. Gorbey. [1001565710] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 05/09/2024 09:04 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Michael S. Gorbey ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Michael S. Gorbey. [1001554615] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 04/18/2024 10:30 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00220-RDB. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001554578] [24-6362] RP [Entered: 04/18/2024 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Owlfeather-Gorbey v. Mohamed Mubarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S. GORBEY
Represented By: Michael S. Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUBAREK, Doctor
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM GERA, P.A.
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANMETER, Nurse
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. EIRICH
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMELTON, HSS
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?