US v. Ernest Weldon
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ERNEST JAMES WELDON
Case Number: 25-6116
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition-Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ernest James Weldon. [1001744400] [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 03/28/2025 01:40 PM]
March 17, 2025 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Ernest James Weldon re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Ernest James Weldon. [1001738039] [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 03/17/2025 04:36 PM]
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed deferring action on Motion for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Ernest James Weldon [ # 5 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Ernest James Weldon. [1001723870] [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 02/20/2025 09:52 AM]
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001723225] Due: 03/07/2025. [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 02/19/2025 11:24 AM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION by Ernest James Weldon for certificate of appealability. Date and method of service: 02/18/2025 US mail. [1001723738] [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 02/19/2025 06:02 PM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001722540]. Due: 03/04/2025. [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 02/18/2025 03:00 PM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ernest James Weldon. [1001722534] Informal Opening Brief due 03/14/2025. [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 02/18/2025 02:59 PM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 2255 case docketed. Originating case numbers: 3:22-cr-00764-JFA-1, 3:24-cv-01407-JFA. Date notice of appeal filed: 02/14/2025. Case manager: BevWashington. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [1001722529] [25-6116] BAW [Entered: 02/18/2025 02:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Ernest Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Represented By: Lamar J. Fyall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST JAMES WELDON
Represented By: Ernest James Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?