National Rifle Association, et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, et al
Amicus Curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, MOTHERS AGAINST TEEN VIOLENCE, STUDENTS FOR GUN-FREE SCHOOLS IN TEXAS, NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED, GRADUATE STUDENT ASSEMBLY AND STUDENT GOVERNMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN and TEXAS CHAPTERS OF THE BRADY CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, `
Plaintiff / Appellant: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED, ANDREW M. PAYNE, REBEKAH JENNINGS and BRENNAN HARMON
Defendant / Appellee: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, KENNETH MELSON, In His Official Capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives and B. TODD JONES, In His Official Capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Case Number: 11-10959
Filed: October 7, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 SUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 on 02/24/2014. [7574380-1] [11-10959] (CAV)
August 1, 2013 SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [7425345-2] was filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne on 07/29/2013. Supreme Court Number: 13-137. [11-10959] (CAV)
May 8, 2013 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [11-10959] (NFD)
April 30, 2013 COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing en banc (IN DETAIL) filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon [ # 7236650-2 ] With Poll. Mandate pull date is 05/07/2013 Judge(s): EHJ, joined by EGJ, JES, EBC, PRO, and JWE, dissenting. [11-10959] (JRS)
April 29, 2013 REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [ # 7213536-2 ] [11-10959] (JRS)
January 4, 2013 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, and Mr. B. Todd Jones [7263789-1] to the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 [ # 7236650-2 ] Date of Service: 01/04/2013 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Medlock, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta. [11-10959] (Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta )
December 13, 2012 RULE 28(j) LETTER filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne Citation of Supplemental Authority. Date of Service: 12/13/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Medlock, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] (Charles Justin Cooper )
December 11, 2012 RESPONSE DUE to court order Court directive requesting a response [ # 7246249-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline updated to 01/04/2013 [11-10959] (SAT)
December 11, 2012 COURT ORDER granting motion to extend time to file a response to and including 01/04/2013 filed by Appellees Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives and Mr. B. Todd Jones [ # 7247052-2 ] Judge(s): ECP. [11-10959] (SAT)
December 10, 2012 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General and Mr. B. Todd Jones to extend time to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc [ # 7236650-2 ] filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 until 01/04/2013 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 12/10/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Medlock, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] (Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta )
December 7, 2012 COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 [ # 7236650-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 12/17/2012. [11-10959] (NFD)
November 28, 2012 Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (NFD)
November 27, 2012 PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 [ # 7236650-2 ]. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 12/03/2012 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Andrew M. Payne. [11-10959] (NFD)
November 27, 2012 PETITION filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne for rehearing en banc [7236650-2]. Date of Service: 11/27/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Medlock, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] (Charles Justin Cooper )
October 25, 2012 COSTS TAXED AGAINST: Each party bear its own costs on appeal. [11-10959] (JRS)
October 25, 2012 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [11-10959] (JRS)
October 25, 2012 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [11-10959 Affirmed] Judge: CDK , Judge: ECP , Judge: CH. Mandate pull date is 12/17/2012 [11-10959] (JRS)
July 10, 2012 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges King, Prado, Haynes. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Charles Justin Cooper arguing for Appellant Brennan Harmon, Appellant Rebekah Jennings, Appellant Incorporated National Rifle Association of America, Appellant Andrew M. Payne; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta arguing for Appellee Tobacco Bureau of Alcohol, Firearms, Appellee Jr. Holder, U. S. Attorney General, Appellee B. Todd Jones [11-10959] (SMH)
May 30, 2012 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Tuesday, 07/10/2012 in Houston -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [11-10959] (SMH)
May 14, 2012 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 07/09/2012. [11-10959] (GAM)
March 22, 2012 LETTER filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne Date of Service: 03/22/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Medlock, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. LETTER [11-10959] (SEND TO SCR. JUDGE AND PANEL) (Charles Justin Cooper )
March 2, 2012 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (CAG)
February 16, 2012 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne Date of service: 02/16/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Medlock; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/05/2012 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Andrew M. Payne. [11-10959] (Charles Justin Cooper )
February 6, 2012 Paper copies of amicus brief received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (CAG)
January 31, 2012 CASE CAPTION updated. Amici Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Graduate Student Assembly and Student Government of the University of Texas at Austin, Mothers Against Teen Violence, Students for Gun-Free Schools in Texas and Texas Chapters of the Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence added to case. Reason: Amicus Brief filed. [11-10959] (MKC)
January 30, 2012 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellees Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Mr. Kenneth Melson and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives in 11-10959 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (SMH)
January 30, 2012 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellees Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Mr. B. Todd Jones and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives in 11-10959 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (SMH)
January 30, 2012 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Scott Charles Medlock for Amicus Curiae Texas Chapters of the Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Students for Gun-Free Schools in Texas, Mothers Against Teen Violence, Graduate Student Assembly and Student Government of the University of Texas at Austin, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 11-10959 [11-10959] (MKC)
January 30, 2012 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence; Graduate Student Assembly and Student Government of the University of Texas at Austin; Mothers Against Teen Violence; Student Government of the University of Texas at Austin and Students for Gun-Free Schools in Texas. Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants-Appellees Date of service: 01/30/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellees: Dasgupta, Riess [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/06/2012 for Amici Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Graduate Student Assembly and Student Government of the University of Texas at Austin and Students for Gun-Free Schools in Texas, Texas Chapters of the Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence. [11-10959] (Scott Charles Medlock )
January 27, 2012 RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic Pleadings, 5; ROA deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (MKC)
January 25, 2012 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Daniel Riess is designated as inactive in this case. Reason: no appearance form. [11-10959] (MKC)
January 25, 2012 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising all parties of new caption [11-10959] (NFD)
January 25, 2012 RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Mr. Kenneth Melson and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives in 11-10959 [ # 6999902-2 ]. Additional number of copies provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 01/30/2012 for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, B Todd Jones. [11-10959] (NFD)
January 25, 2012 BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Mr. Kenneth Melson and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives in 11-10959 [ # 6999918-2 ]. Additional number of copies provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/30/2012 for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, B Todd Jones. [11-10959] (NFD)
January 25, 2012 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Kenneth Melson in 11-10959 substituted by Appellee B Todd Jones in 11-10959 [11-10959] (NFD)
January 25, 2012 LETTER - stating that the party, Kenneth Melson is no longer the Director of ATF. The new acting director is B Todd Jones. filed by Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General and Mr. Kenneth Melson [11-10959] (NFD)
January 25, 2012 PHONE EXTENSION CONFIRMED for Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne. Extension granted to and including 02/16/2012. Reply Brief deadline updated to 02/16/2012 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Andrew M. Payne [11-10959] (NFD)
January 25, 2012 RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT. ROA due on 02/09/2012 [11-10959] (NFD)
January 23, 2012 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General and Mr. Kenneth Melson Date of service: 01/23/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED -BRIEF INSUFFICIENT: Caption Incorrect # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 02/01/2012 for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Kenneth Melson.. Reply Brief due on 02/09/2012 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Andrew M. Payne [11-10959] (Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta )
January 23, 2012 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives and Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General. Date of service: 01/23/2012 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Johnson, Wholley; Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Mr. Kenneth Melson. Record Excerpts NOT SUFFICIENT: Caption incorrect. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 02/01/2012 for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Kenneth Melson [11-10959] (Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta )
December 16, 2011 Paper copies of amicus brief received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (NFD)
December 16, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Meredith Anne Wholley for party(s) Amicus Curiae National Shooting Sports Foundation Inc, in case 11-10959 [11-10959] (NFD)
December 16, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christopher Paul Johnson for Amicus Curiae National Shooting Sports Foundation Inc in 11-10959 [11-10959] (NFD)
December 12, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.. / Brief of the National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellants Date of service: 12/12/2011 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellee: Dasgupta [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by National Shooting Sports Foundation Inc. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT SUFFICIENT as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief - Christopher Johnson. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/20/2011 for Amicus Curiae National Shooting Sports Foundation Inc. [11-10959] (Christopher Paul Johnson )
December 9, 2011 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (NFD)
December 9, 2011 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon in 11-10959 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (NFD)
December 8, 2011 PHONE EXTENSION CONFIRMED for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Mr. Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General and Mr. Kenneth Melson. Extension granted to and including 01/23/2012. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 01/23/2012 for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Kenneth Melson [11-10959] (NFD)
December 5, 2011 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne. Date of service: 12/05/2011 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellees: Dasgupta, Riess [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 12/13/2011 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Andrew M. Payne. [11-10959] (Charles Justin Cooper )
December 5, 2011 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne Date of service: 12/05/2011 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bustos, Cooper, Koukoutchos, Patterson, Thompson; Attorney for Appellees: Dasgupta, Riess [11-10959] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/13/2011 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Andrew M. Payne.. Appellee's Brief due on 01/09/2012 for Appellees Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General, Kenneth Melson [11-10959] (Charles Justin Cooper )
November 25, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Peter A. Patterson for Appellant Brennan Harmon in 11-10959, Attorney Peter A. Patterson for Appellant Rebekah Jennings in 11-10959, Attorney Peter A. Patterson for Appellant Andrew M. Payne in 11-10959, Attorney Peter A. Patterson for Appellant National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated in 11-10959 [11-10959] (NFD)
November 18, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Fernando Manuel Bustos for Appellant Brennan Harmon in 11-10959, Attorney Fernando Manuel Bustos for Appellant Rebekah Jennings in 11-10959, Attorney Fernando Manuel Bustos for Appellant Andrew M. Payne in 11-10959, Attorney Fernando Manuel Bustos for Appellant National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated in 11-10959 [11-10959] (POK)
November 18, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta for party(s) Appellee Eric H. Holder, Jr., U. S. Attorney General Appellee Kenneth Melson Appellee Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, in case 11-10959 [11-10959] (POK)
November 17, 2011 Attorney Mr. Peter A. Patterson for Appellants National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Mr. Andrew M. Payne, Ms. Rebekah Jennings and Mr. Brennan Harmon is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: Counsel is not admitted. [11-10959] (MAS)
October 25, 2011 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/05/2011 for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Andrew M. Payne. [11-10959] (CAG)
October 19, 2011 NOTICE RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT COURT. ROA Certified by DCt, FILED Certified ROA due deadline satisfied. [11-10959] (CAG)
October 19, 2011 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [6929916-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Notice of Certified ROA due on 11/03/2011. [11-10959] (CAG)
October 17, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian Stuart Koukoutchos for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, Andrew M. Payne, and National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated in 11-10959 [11-10959] (CAG)
October 17, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David H. Thompson for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, Andrew M. Payne, and National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated in 11-10959 [11-10959] (CAG)
October 17, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles Justin Cooper for Appellants Brennan Harmon, Rebekah Jennings, Andrew M. Payne, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated in 11-10959 [11-10959] (CAG)
October 17, 2011 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purpose (no Hearings). [11-10959] (MCS)
October 17, 2011 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne for the Court to process. [11-10959] (Charles Justin Cooper )
October 7, 2011 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne [11-10959] (NFD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Rifle Association, et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Scott Charles Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOTHERS AGAINST TEEN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Scott Charles Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STUDENTS FOR GUN-FREE SCHOOLS IN TEXAS
Represented By: Scott Charles Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Meredith Anne Wholley
Represented By: Christopher Paul Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GRADUATE STUDENT ASSEMBLY AND STUDENT GOVERNMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Represented By: Scott Charles Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS CHAPTERS OF THE BRADY CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, `
Represented By: Scott Charles Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Fernando Manuel Bustos
Represented By: Brian Stuart Koukoutchos
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW M. PAYNE
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Fernando Manuel Bustos
Represented By: Brian Stuart Koukoutchos
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBEKAH JENNINGS
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Fernando Manuel Bustos
Represented By: Brian Stuart Koukoutchos
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENNAN HARMON
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Fernando Manuel Bustos
Represented By: Brian Stuart Koukoutchos
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Represented By: Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH MELSON, In His Official Capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. TODD JONES, In His Official Capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Anisha Sasheen Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?