David Wilson v. Gerald Birnberg, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant: DAVID BUREN WILSON
Defendant - Appellee: GERALD BIRNBERG, In His Capacity as Chairan of the Harris County Democratic Party, BEVERLY KAUFMAN, Harris County Clerk, HOPE ANDRADE, Secretary of State, GREGG ABBOTT, Texas Attorney General and EDWARD EMMETT, Harris County Judge
Case Number: 11-20035
Filed: January 17, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Voting (Civil Rights)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 16, 2011 David Wilson v. Gerald Birnberg, et al
October 5, 2011 Summary Wilson v. Birnberg, et al.
January 12, 2012 Summary Wilson v. Birnberg, et al.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 501725019 REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [6992115-2] [11-20035]
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 501623886 REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [6920085-2] [11-20035]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Wilson v. Gerald Birnberg, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: DAVID BUREN WILSON
Represented By: Keith A. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GERALD BIRNBERG, In His Capacity as Chairan of the Harris County Democratic Party
Represented By: Michael Martin Essmyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: BEVERLY KAUFMAN, Harris County Clerk
Represented By: F Clinton Gambill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: HOPE ANDRADE, Secretary of State
Represented By: Kathlyn C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GREGG ABBOTT, Texas Attorney General
Represented By: Kathlyn C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: EDWARD EMMETT, Harris County Judge
Represented By: F Clinton Gambill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?