Delek Refining, Limited v. Local 202, Untd Steel, Paper
Defendant / Appellee: LOCAL 202, UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFLCIO
Plaintiff / Appellant: DELEK REFINING, LIMITED
Case Number: 17-40593
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. The Bill of Costs is issued with the mandate. [17-40593] (SBS) [Entered: 06/25/2018 08:58 AM]
June 1, 2018 BILL OF COSTS filed by Appellee Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO. [17-40593] (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 06/01/2018 01:00 PM]
June 1, 2018 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [17-40593] (EAB) [Entered: 06/01/2018 11:18 AM]
June 1, 2018 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [17-40593 Affirmed] Judge: PEH, Judge: LHS, Judge: GJC. Mandate issue date is 06/25/2018 [17-40593] (EAB) [Entered: 06/01/2018 11:14 AM]
March 5, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Higginbotham, Southwick, Costa. Arguing Person Information Updated for: H. Michael Bush arguing for Appellant Limited Delek Refining; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Patrick M. Flynn arguing for Appellee United Steel Local 202, Paper and Forestry [17-40593] (SME) [Entered: 03/05/2018 12:41 PM]
January 24, 2018 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Monday, 03/05/2018 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [17-40593] (SME) [Entered: 01/24/2018 01:11 PM]
January 12, 2018 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 03/05/2018. [17-40593] (GAM) [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:47 AM]
October 19, 2017 BRIEFING COMPLETE.Reply Brief deadline canceled [17-40593] (ABT) [Entered: 10/19/2017 07:48 AM]
October 10, 2017 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO in 17-40593 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-40593] (Jd) [Entered: 10/10/2017 03:54 PM]
September 28, 2017 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 10/12/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited. Paper Copies of Brief due on 10/10/2017 for Appellee Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO. [17-40593] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO. Date of service: 09/28/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Bush; Attorney for Appellee: Flynn [17-40593] (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 09/28/2017 01:38 PM]
September 21, 2017 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited in 17-40593 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [17-40593] (Jd) [Entered: 09/21/2017 02:33 PM]
September 21, 2017 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited in 17-40593 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-40593] (Jd) [Entered: 09/21/2017 01:57 PM]
September 14, 2017 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited in 17-40593 [ # 8581187-2 ] Date of service: 09/14/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Bush; Attorney for Appellee: Flynn [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:19 PM]
September 12, 2017 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited in 17-40593 [ # 8581187-2 ] Record Excerpts correction has been deemed DEFICIENT. Corrections required: Tabs not numbered correctly. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline updated to 09/19/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited [17-40593] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited and Appellee Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO in 17-40593 [ # 8581187-2 ] Date of service: 09/12/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Bush; Attorney for Appellee: Flynn [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 09/12/2017 10:28 AM]
September 11, 2017 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited in 17-40593 [ # 8581182-2 ] Date of service: 09/11/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Bush; Attorney for Appellee: Flynn [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:33 PM]
August 31, 2017 SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/25/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited. (SEE NOTICE) [17-40593] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. [17-40593] RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require a correct caption. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 09/14/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited [17-40593] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited. Date of service: 08/31/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Bush; Attorney for Appellee: Flynn [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 08/31/2017 04:36 PM]
August 31, 2017 SUFFICIENT APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/19/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited. (SEE NOTICE) [17-40593] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a correct caption. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 09/14/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited.. Appellee's Brief due on 10/02/2017 for Appellee Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO [17-40593] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Delek Refining, Limited. Date of service: 08/31/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Bush; Attorney for Appellee: Flynn [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 08/31/2017 04:35 PM]
August 25, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney H. Michael Bush for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited in 17-40593 [17-40593] (Jd) [Entered: 08/25/2017 08:57 AM]
August 23, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. H. Michael Bush, Esq. for Delek Refining, Limited for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 08/23/2017 02:50 PM]
August 23, 2017 Attorney Mr. H. Michael Bush, Esq. for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited is advised to resubmit an appearance form using the correct short title. [17-40593] (LBM) [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:29 AM]
August 21, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. H. Michael Bush, Esq. for Delek Refining, Limited for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-40593] (H. Michael Bush ) [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:41 PM]
July 19, 2017 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited. Extension Granted to and including 08/31/2017. Reason: No Opposition Stated. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 08/31/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited [17-40593] (VC) [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:47 PM]
June 27, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Patrick M. Flynn for Appellee Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO in 17-40593 [17-40593] (Jd) [Entered: 06/27/2017 04:19 PM]
June 23, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Patrick M. Flynn, Esq. for Local 202, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-40593] (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 06/23/2017 03:13 PM]
June 22, 2017 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/01/2017 for Appellant Delek Refining, Limited. [17-40593] (DDL) [Entered: 06/22/2017 09:18 AM]
June 22, 2017 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [17-40593] (DDL) [Entered: 06/22/2017 09:16 AM]
June 9, 2017 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 6:15-CV-491. Electronic ROA due on 06/26/2017. [17-40593] (LCA) [Entered: 06/09/2017 11:52 AM]
June 9, 2017 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8517056-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [17-40593] (LCA) [Entered: 06/09/2017 11:50 AM]
June 2, 2017 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Delek Refining, Limited [17-40593] (LCA) [Entered: 06/02/2017 10:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Delek Refining, Limited v. Local 202, Untd Steel, Paper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOCAL 202, UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFLCIO
Represented By: Patrick M. Flynn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DELEK REFINING, LIMITED
Represented By: H. Michael Bush Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?